Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/23/2019 at 07:36:27 (UTC).

Valley Creek Land & Timber, LLC v. Colonial Pipeline Company

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 Valley Creek Land Timber, LLC filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against Colonial Pipeline Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John H England, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00970

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John H England, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Valley Creek Land & Timber, LLC

Defendant

Colonial Pipeline Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven A Martino

Attorney at TAYLOR - MARTINO PC

P O Box 894

Mobile, AL 36601

David M. McMullan

Attorney at BARRETT LAW GROUP, P.A.

404 Court Square North

Lexington, MS 39095

John W Barrett

Attorney at BARRETT LAW GROUP, P.A.

404 Court Square

Lexington, MS 39095

Richard R. Barrett

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD R. BARRETT, PLLC

2086 Old Taylor Road, Ste. 1011

Oxford, MS 38655

Gerald M. Abdalla

Attorney at ABDALLA LAW, PLLC

602 Steed Rd., Suite 200

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Defendant Attorneys

Phil Sandick

Attorney at ALSTON & BIRD, LLP

1201 West Peachtree Street

Atlanta, GA 30309

W. Clay Massey

Attorney at ALSTON & BIRD, LLP

1201 West Peachtree Street

Atlanta, GA 30309

Alan D Mathis

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP

One Federal Place, 1819 5Th Avenue North Suite 1000

Birmingham, AL 35203

Meaghan Goodwin Boyd

Attorney at ALSTON & BIRD, LLP

1201 West Peachtree Street

Atlanta, GA 30309-3424

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Motion is RIPE 8/21/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Valley Creek Land & Timber, LLC. (Martino, Steven) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#18

(#18) ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/13/2019. (AFS) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#17

(#17) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than 9/27/2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after 9/27/2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on 9/13/2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/13/2019. (AFS) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

15 #7

Exhibit F - Access Agreement

15 #6

Exhibit E - ADEM Letter

15 #5

Exhibit D - ARBCA Evaluation Work Plan

15 #4

Exhibit C - Groundwater Sampling Event Report

15 #1

Memorandum of Law in Support

#15

(#15) MOTION to Dismiss by Colonial Pipeline Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Amended Corrective Action Order, #3 Exhibit B - Comprehensive Investigation Report, #4 Exhibit C - Groundwater Sampling Event Report, #5 Exhibit D - ARBCA Evaluation Work Plan, #6 Exhibit E - ADEM Letter, #7 Exhibit F - Access Agreement)(Sandick, Phil) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Colonial Pipeline Company mailed certified mail. (AFS) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

Filing Fee: Filing fee $400, receipt_number (ALND B4601098625) 1126-3376410. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Colonial Pipeline Company, filed by Valley Creek Land & Timber, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(AFS). (Martino, Steven) Modified on 6/25/2019 (AFS). (Entered: 06/24/2019)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 8/21/2019. (CDG) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Motion is RIPE 8/21/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Valley Creek Land & Timber, LLC. (Martino, Steven) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/13/2019. (AFS) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than 9/27/2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after 9/27/2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on 9/13/2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/13/2019. (AFS) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) TEXT ORDER setting briefing schedule re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Colonial Pipeline Company. Plaintiff's response is due by August 26, 2019. Defendant's reply, if any, is due by September 2, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 8/13/2019. (CDG) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION to Dismiss by Colonial Pipeline Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Amended Corrective Action Order, #3 Exhibit B - Comprehensive Investigation Report, #4 Exhibit C - Groundwater Sampling Event Report, #5 Exhibit D - ARBCA Evaluation Work Plan, #6 Exhibit E - ADEM Letter, #7 Exhibit F - Access Agreement)(Sandick, Phil) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Colonial Pipeline Company. filed by Colonial Pipeline Company (Sandick, Phil) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) TEXT ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 8/6/2019. (CDG) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Support of Motion to Dismiss Motion is RIPE 8/6/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Colonial Pipeline Company. (Mathis, Alan) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice attorneys Meghan Boyd, W. Clay Massey and Phil Sandick, but with the understanding and on the condition they pay the applicable fee and register for e-filing and notification within 14 days, unless they have already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/1/2019. (AVC) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2019
  • PHV Fee paid: $75, (ALND B 4601099412) receipt number 1126-3399272. (Martino, Steven) Modified on 7/29/2019 (AFS). (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • PHV Fee paid: $75, (ALND B4601099411) receipt number 1126-3399268. (Martino, Steven) Modified on 7/29/2019 (AFS). (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice- John W, Barrett, David McMullan, Jr, Richard R. Barrett, and Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr. Motion is RIPE 7/26/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Valley Creek Land & Timber, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A COGS Don Barrett, #2 Exhibit B COGS David McMullan, Jr., #3 Exhibit C COGS Richard Barrett, #4 Exhibit D COGS Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.)(Martino, Steven) Modified text on 7/26/2019 (MRR, ). (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's responsive pleading is due August 12, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 07/12/2019. (CLS2) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Colonial Pipeline Company to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Motion is RIPE 7/12/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Colonial Pipeline Company. (Mathis, Alan) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed Colonial Pipeline Company served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (AFS) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Colonial Pipeline Company mailed certified mail. (AFS) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing Fee: Filing fee $400, receipt_number (ALND B4601098625) 1126-3376410. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Colonial Pipeline Company, filed by Valley Creek Land & Timber, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(AFS). (Martino, Steven) Modified on 6/25/2019 (AFS). (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Colonial Pipeline Company, filed by Valley Creek Land & Timber, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(AFS) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John W. Barrett