This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/13/2020 at 08:00:59 (UTC).

VALLECILLO v. EEMBASSY OF THE REPUBLIC OF SOUTH AFRICA

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 VALLECILLO filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against EEMBASSY OF THE REPUBLIC OF SOUTH AFRICA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Randolph D. Moss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00432

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Randolph D. Moss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rafael VALLECILLO

Defendants

EMBASSY OF SOUTH AFRICA

EMBASSY OF THE REPUBLIC OF SOUTH AFRICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael E. Veve

Attorney at MICHAEL E. VEVE, PLLC

5029-A Backlick Road

Annandale, VA 22003

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to EMBASSY OF THE REPUBLIC OF SOUTH AFRICA. (ztd) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re Notice of Corrected Docket Entry filed by RAFAEL VALLECILLO. Related document: Notice of Corrected Docket Entry.(Veve, Michael) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/14/20. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

2 #1

Notice and Consent

#2

(#2) ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to EMBASSY OF SOUTH AFRICA. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) Modified on 2/28/2020 (adh, ). (Entered: 02/14/2020)

1 #3

Notice and Consent

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6829655) filed by Rafael VALLECILLO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Notice and Consent)(Veve, Michael) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to EMBASSY OF THE REPUBLIC OF SOUTH AFRICA. (ztd) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re Notice of Corrected Docket Entry filed by RAFAEL VALLECILLO. Related document: Notice of Corrected Docket Entry.(Veve, Michael) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #2 Summons Issued Electronically was entered in error and counsel notified to refile correct AO 440 Summons (adh, ) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/14/20. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to EMBASSY OF SOUTH AFRICA. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) Modified on 2/28/2020 (adh, ). (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6829655) filed by Rafael VALLECILLO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Notice and Consent)(Veve, Michael) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Edward Veve