This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/27/2021 at 10:13:10 (UTC).

Vallandingham v. Ambulatory Medical Care, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 Vallandingham filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Ambulatory Medical Care, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William O. Bertelsman and Candace J. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00027

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William O. Bertelsman

Referral Judge

Candace J. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cherae Vallandingham

Defendants

Ambulatory Medical Care doing business as Doctor's Urgent Care

Ambulatory Medical Care, Inc. doing business as Doctor's Urgent Care

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Randy J. Blankenship

Attorney at Blankenship Massey & Associates, PLLC

504 Erlanger Road

Erlanger, KY 41018

N. Jeffrey Blankenship

Attorney at Ziegler & Schneider, P.S.C.

541 Buttermilk Pike, Suite 500, P.O. Box 175710

Covington, KY 41017-5710

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer Bame

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - Louisville

400 W. Market Street, 32Nd Floor

Louisville, KY 40202

Robert D. Hudson

Attorney at Frost, Brown, Todd, LLC - Florence

7310 Turfway Road, Suite 210

Florence, KY 41042

Michael E. Nitardy

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - Cincinnati

301 E. Fourth Street, 3300 Great American Tower

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A-State Court Records-Pleadings, Summons

1 #2

Exhibit b-P. Amrhein Declaration

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AGREED ORDER: that Defendant's correct name, Ambulatory Medical Care, Inc. d/b/a Doctor's Urgent Care, be substituted herein for the name Ambulatory Medical Care d/b/a Doctor's Urgent Care. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 4/12/2021. (ECO)cc: COR Modified on 4/13/2021 (ECO). (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #11 Proposed Agreed Order Substituting Correct Corporate Name by Ambulatory Medical Care (ECO) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Proposed Agreed Order Substituting Correct Corporate Name by Ambulatory Medical Care. (Hudson, Robert) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: A. DEADLINES AND CASE SCHEDULE: The following deadlines for discovery and general pretrial proceedings are imposed: 1) Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by April 10, 2021; 2) Amended pleadings by consent or motion and/or motions to join parties Plaintiff - by June 1, 2021; Defendant by July 1, 2021;3) Mid-Discovery Status Report by July 22, 2021; 4) Rule 26(a)(2)(A) expert identity disclosure accompanied by either (a)(2)(B) report or (a)(2)(C) summary disclosure Plaintiff's experts by August 2, 2021; Defendant's experts by October 1, 2021; 5) Completion of discovery by December 1, 2021; 6) Close of Discovery Status Report by December 1, 2021; 7) Dispositive Motions by January 3, 2022; 8) Deadline Extensions must be requested prior to expiration of the applicable deadline; 9) Other Proposals The parties have set forth their agreed upon terms with respect to preservation of discovery information; production of ESI; and inadvertent production of privileged materials. To the extent their proposed terms do not conflict with the Federal Rules, they are approved and adopted. (See Order for Details). B. DISCOVERY DISPUTE PROCEDURE: To facilitate the supervision of discovery, the parties shall utilize the following procedure to address discovery disputes: 1) Parties shall first confer directly and in good faith and attempt to resolve the discovery dispute between themselves, without judicial intervention; 2) If the parties are unable to resolve the dispute after conferring directly, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreement by calling Chambers to schedule an informal telephone conference; and 3) If, and only if, the parties are unable to resolve their discovery impasse after informal telephone conference with the Court, they may file appropriate written motions. Written motions regarding discovery shall include the certification required by Civil Rule 37(a)(1) and Local Rule of Civil Practice 37.1, if applicable. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 3/23/2021.(ECO)cc: COR Modified bold text on 3/23/2021 (ECO). (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: That the parties shall confer and within fifteen (15) days, the same being not later than April 7, 2021, file a proposed agreed order substituting the correct corporate name of Defendant, or Defendant shall so move by the same deadline if an agreement cannot be reached between the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 3/23/2021.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: #8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (ECO) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hudson, Robert) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: Pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties shall confer no later than March 19, 2021, to consider the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case, to make or arrange for the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1), and to develop a proposed discovery plan. Such proposed schedule shall be filed no later than March 26, 2021. Upon the filing of the proposed schedule, the Court will review the plan and determine whether a preliminary pretrial conference is needed. If the Court determines that a conference is not necessary, a scheduling order will be issued based upon the plan filed by the parties. If the Court determines that a conference should be held, an order scheduling the same shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 3/5/2021.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: Answer to Complaint (ECO) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ambulatory Medical Care. (Bame, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF FILING by Ambulatory Medical Care (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet)(Bame, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Jennifer Bame/Robert Hudson. #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by Ambulatory Medical Care without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (ECO) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDNG REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketConflict Check run. (ECO) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ambulatory Medical Care. (Filed as part of State Court Record DE#1 , Exhibit A). (ECO) Modified underline on 2/26/2021 (ECO). (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kenton Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-00145. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-4906079), filed by Ambulatory Medical Care. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Records-Pleadings, Summons, #2 Exhibit B-P. Amrhein Declaration)(ECO) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael E. Nitardy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Bame