This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2021 at 11:26:17 (UTC).

Valkova v. Law Offices of Steven Cohen LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 Valkova filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Law Offices of Steven Cohen LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lawrence E. Kahn and Andrew T. Baxter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00941

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lawrence E. Kahn

Referral Judge

Andrew T. Baxter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nadejda M Valkova

Defendants

Law Offices of Steven Cohen LLC

Steven Cohen

Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc

John Does 1-5

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anthony J. Pietrafesa

Attorney at Anthony J Pietrafesa ESQ

313 East Willow Streeet #202

Syracuse, NY 13203

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) LETTER BRIEF updating status to Court by Nadejda M Valkova. (Pietrafesa, Anthony) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for original summons and complaint served on Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc via the NYS Secretary of State on 08/26/2021, filed by Nadejda M Valkova. (Pietrafesa, Anthony) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for original summons and complaint served on Law Office of Steven Cohen LLC via the NYS Secretary of Satte on 08/26/2021, filed by Nadejda M Valkova. (Pietrafesa, Anthony) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

#3

(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 11/19/2021 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/12/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (ztc, ) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

2 #2

Summons issued as to Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc

2 #1

Summons issued as to Steven Cohen

2 #2

Main Document

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's counsel is directed to request an entry of default, file a stipulation of discontinuance, or submit a status report by 10/25/2021. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 10/8/2021. (kmc) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER BRIEF updating status to Court by Nadejda M Valkova. (Pietrafesa, Anthony) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER: On 9/3/2021, plaintiff filed proof of service asserting that the summons and complaint were served upon the defendants on 8/26/2021. The time for defendant to file an answer or otherwise move has expired. Pursuant to Local Rule 55.1, plaintiff may request a clerk's entry of default or, in the alternative, plaintiff is directed to file a status report by 10/8/2021. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 10/1/2021. (kmc) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • Docket***Answer due date updated for Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc answer due 9/16/2021; Law Offices of Steven Cohen LLC answer due 9/16/2021. (ztc, ) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for original summons and complaint served on Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc via the NYS Secretary of State on 08/26/2021, filed by Nadejda M Valkova. (Pietrafesa, Anthony) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for original summons and complaint served on Law Office of Steven Cohen LLC via the NYS Secretary of Satte on 08/26/2021, filed by Nadejda M Valkova. (Pietrafesa, Anthony) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 11/19/2021 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/12/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (ztc, ) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketTEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Does 1-5 in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summonses for service of process on a "John Doe" defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against those defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identities. When plaintiff determines the identity of the"John Doe" defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendants pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time. (ztc, ) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Law Offices of Steven Cohen LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Steven Cohen, #2 Summons issued as to Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc)(ztc, ) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Law Offices of Steven Cohen LLC, Steven Cohen, Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc,, John Does 1-5. (Filing fee $402 receipt number BNYNDC-5622663) filed by Nadejda M Valkova. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztc, ) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Atlantic Credit & Fin Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony J. Pietrafesa