This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/09/2021 at 08:53:20 (UTC).

Valjakka v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On September 10, 2021, Lauri Valjakka (“Lauri” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Erick Scott Robinson of Porter Hedges LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Amazon.com, Inc., Amazon Web Services, Inc., and Amazon.com Services, Inc., (collectively, the “Defendants”). The plaintiff filed suit seeking declaratory and injunctive relief, damages along with prejudgment and post-judgment interest, ongoing royalties, and costs for the Defendant’s alleged infringement of United States Patent No. 8,495,167 (“the ‘167 Patent”), entitled “Data Communications Networks, Systems, Methods and Apparatus”. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the Western District of Texas. 

In the complaint, the plaintiff alleged that, “Defendant has, under 35 U.S.C. §271(a), directly infringed, and continues to directly infringe, literally and/or under the doctrine of equivalents, one or more claims, including without limitation at least claim 1 of the ‘167 Patent, by making, using, testing, selling, offering for sale and/or importing into the United States Defendant’s Accused Products.”

The plaintiff further alleged that, “Defendant also indirectly infringes the ‘167 Patent by actively inducing the direct infringement by third parties under 35 U.S.C. § 271(b). Defendant has knowingly and intentionally actively aided, abetted and induced others to directly infringe at least one claim of the ‘167 Patent (such as its customers in this District and throughout the United States). Defendant continues to induce infringement of the ‘167 Patent. Defendant has contributorily infringed and is a contributory infringer because, with knowledge of the ‘167 Patent, it supplies a material part of an infringing method and/or system, where the material part is not a staple article of commerce, and is incapable of substantial non-infringing use. Defendant contributes to its customers’ infringement because, with knowledge of the ‘167 Patent, Defendant supplies the technology that allows its customers to infringe the patent.”

The only claim for relief laid down by the plaintiff is for the infringement of ‘167 patent, wherein the plaintiff claimed that Defendant has had knowledge that its activities concerning the Accused Products infringe one or more claims of the ‘167 Patent. On information and belief, Defendant will continue to encourage, aid, or otherwise cause third parties to import, sell, offer for sale, and use the Accused Products and Defendant has and will continue to encourage those acts with the specific intent to infringe one or more claims of the ‘167 Patent. 

In its prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested the court for a judgment that Defendant has directly infringed either literally and/or under the doctrine of equivalents and continues to directly infringe the Patent-in-suit, that Defendant has induced infringement and continues to induce infringement of the Patent-in-suit, and that Defendant has and continues to contributorily infringe the Patent-in-suit. The plaintiff requests the court order Defendant to pay Plaintiff damages including past damages, treble damages for willful infringement, and supplemental damages for any continuing post-verdict infringement through entry of the final judgment with an accounting as needed. Further, the plaintiff also requested the court to award Plaintiff injunctive relief, its reasonable attorneys’ fees, pre-judgment and post-judgment interest on the damages and a compulsory ongoing royalty and award such other and further relief as the court deems just and equitable.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00945

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lauri Valjakka

Defendants

Amazon.Com, Inc.

Amazon Web Services, Inc.

Amazon.com Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Erick Scott Robinson

Attorney at Porter Hedges LLP

1000 Main St., 36Th Floor

Houston, TX 77339

Defendant Attorney

Brian Christopher Nash

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

401 Congress Avenue, Suite 1700

Austin, TX 78701-3797

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

#2

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Lauri Valjakka. (Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Amazon.Com, Inc. (jc5) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Amazon Web Services, Inc. (jc5) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Amazon.com Services, Inc. (jc5) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lauri Valjakka. Amazon Web Services, Inc. served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. (Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lauri Valjakka. Amazon.com Services, Inc. served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. (Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lauri Valjakka (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Extension of Time for Defendants' to Respond to Complaint by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc. re #1 Complaint (Nash, Brian) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

5 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Amazon Web Services, Inc. answer due 12/13/2021; Amazon.Com, Inc. answer due 12/13/2021. (jc5) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Extension of Time for Defendants' to Respond to Complaint by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc. re #1 Complaint (Nash, Brian) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lauri Valjakka (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lauri Valjakka. Amazon.com Services, Inc. served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. (Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lauri Valjakka. Amazon Web Services, Inc. served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. (Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Amazon.com Services, Inc. (jc5) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Amazon Web Services, Inc. (jc5) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Amazon.Com, Inc. (jc5) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Lauri Valjakka. (Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15211480). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Lauri Valjakka. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less