This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 05:16:39 (UTC).

Valente v. Bank of America NA et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 Valente filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against Bank of America NA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maxine M. Chesney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01172

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maxine M. Chesney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Valente

Oakland, CA 94604

Defendants

Bank of America NA

Keller Williams Realty Inc.

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Bank of America NA, Keller Williams Realty Inc. (Filing fee $ 400. Receipt No. 44611016796). Filed by Robert Valente. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2020) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

2 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#2

(#2) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 5/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2020 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2020) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Receipt

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 5/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2020 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2020) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bank of America NA, Keller Williams Realty Inc. (Filing fee $ 400. Receipt No. 44611016796). Filed by Robert Valente. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2020) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.