This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/21/2021 at 09:11:29 (UTC).

Valdez v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/23/2021 Valdez filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christine M. Arguello and Scott T. Varholak. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01999

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christine M. Arguello

Referral Judge

Scott T. Varholak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Serenity Valdez

Defendant

Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Cheri R. Lazar

Attorney at Tucker Holmes PC

7400 East Caley Avenue, Quebec Centre Ii

Centennial, CO 80111-6714

Kurt Hans Henkel

Attorney at Tucker Holmes PC

7400 East Caley Avenue, Quebec Centre Ii

Centennial, CO 80111-6714

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Lazar, Cheri) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Lazar, Cheri) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/19/2021 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/12/2021, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/26/2021. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

#7

(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (agarc, ) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Serenity Valdez.(agarc, ) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#5

(#5) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Serenity Valdez.(agarc, ) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cheri R. Lazar on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company aka Allstate Insurance CompanyAttorney Cheri R. Lazar added to party Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company aka Allstate Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Lazar, Cheri) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

1 #9

Exhibit H

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company aka Allstate Insurance Company from Denver District Court, Case Number 2021CV031711. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7973774), filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company aka Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the #13 Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice filed in this case. Text Only Entry (cmasec) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Lazar, Cheri) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: In light of the parties' #11 Notice of Settlement, the parties are DIRECTED to file appropriate dismissal documents in this matter by NO LATER THAN 8/30/2021. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/29/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Lazar, Cheri) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/19/2021 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/12/2021, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/26/2021. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2021
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Magistrate Judge Varholak is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/25/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec) (Entered: 07/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Allstate Fire and Casualty insurance Company on 7/2/2021, filed by Plaintiff Serenity Valdez. (agarc, ) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (agarc, ) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Serenity Valdez.(agarc, ) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Serenity Valdez.(agarc, ) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (agarc, ) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, ) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cheri R. Lazar on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company aka Allstate Insurance CompanyAttorney Cheri R. Lazar added to party Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company aka Allstate Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Lazar, Cheri) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company aka Allstate Insurance Company from Denver District Court, Case Number 2021CV031711. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7973774), filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company aka Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kurt Hans Henkel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cheri R. Lazar