This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2021 at 10:40:53 (UTC).

Juan Valdez v. FCA US LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 Juan Valdez filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando M. Olguin and Maria A. Audero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05794

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Juan Valdez

Petitioners and Defendants

FCA US LLC

Does 1-10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steve Mikhov

Attorney at Knight Law Group LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Amy-Lyn Morse

Attorney at Knight Law Group LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Gregory Richard Mohrman

Attorney at Knight Law Group LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 91367

Maite Christine Colon

Attorney at Knight Law Group LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Scot D Wilson

Attorney at Knight Law Group LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Petitioner and Defendant Attorneys

Georges Andrew Haddad

Attorney at Clark Hill LLP

505 Montgomery Street 13Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Candace Jin Frazier

Attorney at Clark Hill LLP

505 Montgomery Street 13Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Michael Benjamin Sachs

Attorney at Clark Hill LLP

505 Montgomery Street 13Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The court has scheduled the dates set forth on the last three pages of this Order after review of the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report. Therefore, the court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. The Final pretrial conference and hearing on motions in limine is scheduled for September 9, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. The trial is scheduled to begin on Tuesday, September 27, 2022, at 9:00 a.m. On the first day of trial, counsel must appear at 8:45 a.m. to discuss preliminary matters with the court, [See document for details.] (et) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#15

(#15) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-4 days, filed by Plaintiff Juan Valdez.. (Colon, Maite) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

#14

(#14) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Maite Christine Colon counsel for Plaintiff Juan Valdez. Adding Maite Colon as counsel of record for Juan Valdez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Juan Valdez. (Attorney Maite Christine Colon added to party Juan Valdez(pty:pla))(Colon, Maite) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

#13

(#13) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gregory Richard Mohrman counsel for Plaintiff Juan Valdez. Adding Greg Mohrman as counsel of record for Juan Valdez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Juan Valdez. (Attorney Gregory Richard Mohrman added to party Juan Valdez(pty:pla))(Mohrman, Gregory) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

#12

(#12) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Scot D Wilson counsel for Plaintiff Juan Valdez. Adding Scot D. Wilson as counsel of record for Juan Valdez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Juan Valdez. (Attorney Scot D Wilson added to party Juan Valdez(pty:pla))(Wilson, Scot) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 9/16/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#9

(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE To Adverse Party of Removal filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Haddad, Georges) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Movant FCA US LLC identifying FCA US LLC as Corporate Parent. (Haddad, Georges) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#4

(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant FCA US LLC. (Haddad, Georges) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#3

(#3) DECLARATION of James Sheridan filed by Movant FCA US LLC. (Haddad, Georges) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#2

(#2) DECLARATION of Candace Frazier filed by Movant FCA US LLC. (Haddad, Georges) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from LASC, case number 21STCV22611 Receipt No: ACACDC-31648822 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attorney Georges Andrew Haddad added to party FCA US LLC(pty:bkmov))(Haddad, Georges) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The court has scheduled the dates set forth on the last three pages of this Order after review of the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report. Therefore, the court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. The Final pretrial conference and hearing on motions in limine is scheduled for September 9, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. The trial is scheduled to begin on Tuesday, September 27, 2022, at 9:00 a.m. On the first day of trial, counsel must appear at 8:45 a.m. to discuss preliminary matters with the court, [See document for details.] (et) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-4 days, filed by Plaintiff Juan Valdez.. (Colon, Maite) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Maite Christine Colon counsel for Plaintiff Juan Valdez. Adding Maite Colon as counsel of record for Juan Valdez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Juan Valdez. (Attorney Maite Christine Colon added to party Juan Valdez(pty:pla))(Colon, Maite) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gregory Richard Mohrman counsel for Plaintiff Juan Valdez. Adding Greg Mohrman as counsel of record for Juan Valdez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Juan Valdez. (Attorney Gregory Richard Mohrman added to party Juan Valdez(pty:pla))(Mohrman, Gregory) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Scot D Wilson counsel for Plaintiff Juan Valdez. Adding Scot D. Wilson as counsel of record for Juan Valdez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Juan Valdez. (Attorney Scot D Wilson added to party Juan Valdez(pty:pla))(Wilson, Scot) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 9/16/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketNON CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 5 TO NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)(ghap) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, FCA US LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Juan Valdez. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/17/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1 TO NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) (ghap) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE To Adverse Party of Removal filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Haddad, Georges) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Movant FCA US LLC identifying FCA US LLC as Corporate Parent. (Haddad, Georges) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant FCA US LLC. (Haddad, Georges) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of James Sheridan filed by Movant FCA US LLC. (Haddad, Georges) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION of Candace Frazier filed by Movant FCA US LLC. (Haddad, Georges) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from LASC, case number 21STCV22611 Receipt No: ACACDC-31648822 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attorney Georges Andrew Haddad added to party FCA US LLC(pty:bkmov))(Haddad, Georges) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Benjamin Sachs

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Georges A. Haddad