This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:46:41 (UTC).

Vaitiekunaite v. Barr et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Vaitiekunaite filed an Immigration - Naturalization lawsuit against Barr. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gary Feinerman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03330

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Naturalization

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary Feinerman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rita VAITIEKUNAITE

U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

Defendants

Thomas CHIOPPA

Attorney General William Barr

Kevin McAleenan

US Attorney's Office

William Barr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Brent Kelly Newcomb

Attorney at Law Office of Brent K. Newcomb

902 Huntington Drive

Elk Grove, IL 60007

AUSA - Chicago

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office (NDIL - Chicago)

219 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60604

Elizabeth Inez Treacy

Attorney at United States Attorney''s Office (NDIL-Chicago)

219 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

#8

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#7

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Defendants' agreed motion to remand #7 is granted. This case is remanded to the U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services to issue a decision on Plaintiff's naturalization application within the next 30 days. This remand is without prejudice to Plaintiff pursuing any available administrative and judicial remedies in the event of an adverse decision. Motion hearing set for 7/1/2019 #8 is stricken. The status hearing set for 7/1/2019 #5 is stricken. Civil case closed. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Defendants' agreed motion to remand #7 is granted. This case is remanded to the U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services to issue a decision on Plaintiff's naturalization application within the next 30 days. This remand is without prejudice to Plaintiff pursuing any available administrative and judicial remedies in the event of an adverse decision. Motion hearing set for 7/1/2019 #8 is stricken. The status hearing set for 7/1/2019 #5 is stricken. Civil case closed. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Motion by Craig Arthur Oswald for presentment of motion to remand #7 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/1/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION by Defendants William Barr, Thomas Chioppa, Kevin McAleenan to remand (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendants William Barr, Thomas Chioppa, Kevin McAleenan (Treacy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 7/1/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to William Barr, Thomas CHIOPPA, Kevin McAleenan, US Attorney's Office, U.S. Attorney. (daj, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rita VAITIEKUNAITE by Brent Kelly Newcomb (Newcomb, Brent) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Newcomb, Brent) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Rita VAITIEKUNAITE; n. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15836304.(Newcomb, Brent) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.