This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/10/2022 at 08:19:34 (UTC).

Vahe Andonian et al v. BMW of North America, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/11/2021 Vahe Andonian filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW of North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and Patricia Donahue. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-08897

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judge

Patricia Donahue

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vahe Andonian

Edmond Andonian

Defendants

BMW of North America, LLC

Does 1 through 20, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeeho Henberwithz Lim

Attorney at Consumer Legal Services PC

2330 Long Beach Boulevard

Long Beach, CA 90806

Christopher Michael Lovasz

Attorney at Consumer Legal Services PC

2330 Long Beach Boulevard

Long Beach, CA 90806

Defendant Attorneys

Lisa R Weddle

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

300 South Grand Avenue 22Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3132

Behrouz Shareghi Arani

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

300 South Grand Avenue 22Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3132

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B - Answer to Complaint

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Shareghi Arani, Behrouz) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

#3

(#3) DECLARATION of Behrouz Shareghi Arani re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Shareghi Arani, Behrouz) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Behrouz Shareghi Arani on behalf of Defendant BMW of North America, LLC (Shareghi Arani, Behrouz) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Certification of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC identifying BMW (US) Holding Corporation; BMW AG as Corporate Parent. (Shareghi Arani, Behrouz) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (ghap) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/14/2022. (tj) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/14/2022. (tj) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (ghap) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/10/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants BMW of North America, LLC, Does 1 through 20, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Vahe Andonian, Edmond Andonian. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/12/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Certification of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC identifying BMW (US) Holding Corporation; BMW AG as Corporate Parent. (Shareghi Arani, Behrouz) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Behrouz Shareghi Arani on behalf of Defendant BMW of North America, LLC (Shareghi Arani, Behrouz) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Behrouz Shareghi Arani re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Shareghi Arani, Behrouz) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Shareghi Arani, Behrouz) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV37725 Receipt No: ACACDC-32312315 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer to Complaint) (Attorney Behrouz Shareghi Arani added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Shareghi Arani, Behrouz) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Behrouz Shareghi Arani