This case was last updated from PACER on 03/12/2019 at 07:27:21 (UTC).

Vadella et al v. American States Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 Vadella filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against American States Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert D. Mariani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00073

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert D. Mariani

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ann Vadella

Joseph J. Vadella

Defendant

American States Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas W. Munley

Attorney at Minora, Minora, Colbassani, Krowiak & Mattioli

700 Vine Street

Scranton, PA 18510

Jason J. Mattioli

Attorney at Minora, Minora, Colbassani, Krowiak & Mattioli

700 Vine St

Scranton, PA 18510

Defendant Attorney

William C. Foster

Attorney at Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin

2000 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) RESPONSE by Ann Vadella, Joseph J. Vadella to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #4 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Munley, Thomas) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

9 #1

Exhibit(s)

#9

(#9) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #4 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ann Vadella, Joseph J. Vadella. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Munley, Thomas) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall have an extension of time until 3/11/19 to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 2/20/19 (jam) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

7 #1

Certificate of Concurrence

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Ann Vadella, Joseph J. Vadella. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Concurrence)(Munley, Thomas) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#6

(#6) BRIEF IN SUPPORT Motion to Dismiss Bad Faith Claim re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by American States Insurance Company.(Foster, William) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

5 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#5

(#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by American States Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Foster, William) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

4 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#4

(#4) First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by American States Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Memo Brief in Support of Motion)(Foster, William) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#3

(#3) LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 1/14/19. (jam) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#2

(#2) EXHIBITS by American States Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (ao) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American States Insurance Company from Court of Common Pleas of Lackawanna County, case number 2018-CV-4671. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4645387), filed by American States Insurance Company.(ao) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RESPONSE by Ann Vadella, Joseph J. Vadella to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #4 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Munley, Thomas) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #4 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ann Vadella, Joseph J. Vadella. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Munley, Thomas) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall have an extension of time until 3/11/19 to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 2/20/19 (jam) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Ann Vadella, Joseph J. Vadella. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Concurrence)(Munley, Thomas) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) BRIEF IN SUPPORT Motion to Dismiss Bad Faith Claim re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by American States Insurance Company.(Foster, William) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by American States Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Foster, William) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by American States Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Memo Brief in Support of Motion)(Foster, William) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LETTER ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 1/14/19. (jam) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) EXHIBITS by American States Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (ao) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American States Insurance Company from Court of Common Pleas of Lackawanna County, case number 2018-CV-4671. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0314-4645387), filed by American States Insurance Company.(ao) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.