This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/14/2022 at 07:22:58 (UTC).

WILLIAMS V THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN

Case Summary

On 02/13/2022 WILLIAMS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Gershwin A. Drain and Kimberly G. Altman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-10296

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gershwin A. Drain

Referral Judge

Kimberly G. Altman

 

Party Details

Defendants and Plaintiffs

SHAMILYA WILLIAMS

University of Michigan

University of Michigan Work Connections

JENNIFER BARNETT

CHRISTINE FERGU

JERRI ATKINS

Senior HR AMY GRIER

University President Mary Sue Coleman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Te Smith

Attorney at Smith Attorneys Group at Law P.C.

47 W. Polk St,, Ste. 100 Box# 545

Chicago, IL 60605

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8791801 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Washtenaw - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Smith, Te) (Entered: 02/13/2022)

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Exhibit Ehibits A-J

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *JENNIFER BARNETT, JERRI ATKINS, Mary Sue Coleman, CHRISTINE FERGU, AMY GRIER, University of Michigan, University of Michigan Work Connections* (DAll) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Smith, Te) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Smith, Te) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *JENNIFER BARNETT, JERRI ATKINS, Mary Sue Coleman, CHRISTINE FERGU, AMY GRIER, University of Michigan, University of Michigan Work Connections* (DAll) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketREQUEST for SUMMONS for All Defendants. (Smith, Te) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ehibits A-J) (Smith, Te) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Error directed to: Te Smith re #1 Complaint,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (LHos) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8791801 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Washtenaw - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Smith, Te) (Entered: 02/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The University of Michigan is a litigant