This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2023 at 07:02:38 (UTC).

Wiley v. ECDI et al.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 Wiley filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against ECDI. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Chelsey M. Vascura and Sarah D. Morrison. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00138

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Chelsey M. Vascura

Presiding Judge

Sarah D. Morrison

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sherry Ann Wiley

Defendants

Fonda Williams

Inna Kinney

Steve Fireman

Anthony Bern

Denise Hicks

April Welch

US Department of Treasury

ECDI

Janet Yellen

Joseph Armstrong

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Michael H. Watson recused. Case reassigned to Judge Sarah D. Morrison for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 01/13/2023. (tla)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against Joseph Armstrong, Anthony Bern, ECDI, Steve Fireman, Denise Hicks, Inna Kinney, US Department of Treasury, April Welch, Fonda Williams, Janet Yellen, filed by Sherry Ann Wiley. (agm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2023: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit part 2) (agm). (Entered: 01/19/2023)

3 #1

*Restricted*

3 #2

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #3 Complaint, filed by Sherry Ann Wiley. For the reasons set forth, Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) is GRANTED. Is is RECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to 1915(e)(2) for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Objections to R&R due by 2/2/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/19/2023. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

#5

(#5) OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations filed by Plaintiff Sherry Ann Wiley. (sem) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#6

(#6) MOTION to speak or make an appointment to meet with Judges Morrison and Vascura filed by Plaintiff Sherry Ann Wiley. (sem) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#7

(#7) MOTION to have U.S. Marshals effect service to defendants filed by Plaintiff Sherry Ann Wiley. (sem) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#8

(#8) ORDER: On February 13, 2023, Plaintiff emailed a number of files to the Clerk's Office and requested they be filed on the docket. Plaintiff is advised that pro se parties are not permitted to electronically file documents without leave of Court. (See Southern District of Ohio CM/ECF Procedures Guide (rev. July 2019), p. 4.) Accordingly, the documents attached to Plaintiff's February 13, 2023 emails will not be docketed. If Plaintiff wishes to file those documents on the docket, she must either submit the documents in hard copy to the Clerk's Office, or file a motion to obtain electronic case filing rights. The Court will not consider any future filings submitted via email. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 02/14/2023. (tla)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Sherry Ann Wiley. (sem) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Receive Case Status Update by Plaintiff Sherry Ann Wiley (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

10 #1

Envelope

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Receive Case Status Update by Plaintiff Sherry Ann Wiley (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Sherry Ann Wiley. (sem) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: On February 13, 2023, Plaintiff emailed a number of files to the Clerk's Office and requested they be filed on the docket. Plaintiff is advised that pro se parties are not permitted to electronically file documents without leave of Court. (See Southern District of Ohio CM/ECF Procedures Guide (rev. July 2019), p. 4.) Accordingly, the documents attached to Plaintiff's February 13, 2023 emails will not be docketed. If Plaintiff wishes to file those documents on the docket, she must either submit the documents in hard copy to the Clerk's Office, or file a motion to obtain electronic case filing rights. The Court will not consider any future filings submitted via email. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 02/14/2023. (tla)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to have U.S. Marshals effect service to defendants filed by Plaintiff Sherry Ann Wiley. (sem) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to speak or make an appointment to meet with Judges Morrison and Vascura filed by Plaintiff Sherry Ann Wiley. (sem) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations filed by Plaintiff Sherry Ann Wiley. (sem) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting 1 Sealed Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/19/2023. (This entry for statistical purposes only. Please see ECF No. #4 for document.) (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #3 Complaint, filed by Sherry Ann Wiley. For the reasons set forth, Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) is GRANTED. Is is RECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to 1915(e)(2) for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Objections to R&R due by 2/2/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/19/2023. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Joseph Armstrong, Anthony Bern, ECDI, Steve Fireman, Denise Hicks, Inna Kinney, US Department of Treasury, April Welch, Fonda Williams, Janet Yellen, filed by Sherry Ann Wiley. (agm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2023: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit part 2) (agm). (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Michael H. Watson recused. Case reassigned to Judge Sarah D. Morrison for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 01/13/2023. (tla)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less