This case was last updated from PACER on 05/16/2020 at 11:23:41 (UTC).

Christina C Anagonye-Bentley v. Village Capital & Investment, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/17/2020 Christina C Anagonye-Bentley filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Village Capital Investment, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony P. Patti and Laurie J. Michelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-10713

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Anthony P. Patti

Presiding Judge

Laurie J. Michelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christina C Anagonye-Bentley

Defendants

Village Capital & Investment, LLC

Mortgage Electronic Registration System aka "MERS"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark A. Linton

Attorney at Ghost Attorney Legal Services

24300 Southfield Rd., Ste. 210

Southfield, MI 48075

Defendant Attorney

Robert J. Kinggo, III

Attorney at Trott Law, P.C.

31440 Northwestern Highway, Suite 200

Farmington Hills, MI 48334

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT REQUIREMENTS AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Interim Status Conference set for 8/26/2020 at 03:00 PM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson; Discovery due by 10/8/2020; and Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 11/9/2020. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (Refer to image for additional dates) (EKar) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#9

(#9) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Kinggo, Robert) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER TO ATTEND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS FOR SUBMISSION OF DISCOVERY PLAN. (Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2020 at 03:00 PM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson) Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

#7

(#7) AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Mortgage Electronic Registration System aka "MERS" (Kinggo, Robert) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Mortgage Electronic Registration System aka "MERS". (Kinggo, Robert) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Kinggo, III on behalf of Mortgage Electronic Registration System aka "MERS". (Kinggo, Robert) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#4

(#4) AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Village Capital & Investment, LLC (Kinggo, Robert) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Village Capital & Investment, LLC. (Kinggo, Robert) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#2

(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Village Capital & Investment, LLC (Kinggo, Robert) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Village Capital & Investment, LLC from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 20-002536-CH. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7686458 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Kinggo, Robert) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT REQUIREMENTS AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Interim Status Conference set for 8/26/2020 at 03:00 PM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson; Discovery due by 10/8/2020; and Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 11/9/2020. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (Refer to image for additional dates) (EKar) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 5/11/2020. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (EKar) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Kinggo, Robert) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY ORDER: Pursuant to 20-AO-021 and the Governor's shelter in place order the scheduling conference set for May 11, 2020 will be held telephonically. The parties will receive dial-in information via email. Issued by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER TO ATTEND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS FOR SUBMISSION OF DISCOVERY PLAN. (Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2020 at 03:00 PM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson) Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EKar) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Mortgage Electronic Registration System aka "MERS" (Kinggo, Robert) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Mortgage Electronic Registration System aka "MERS". (Kinggo, Robert) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Kinggo, III on behalf of Mortgage Electronic Registration System aka "MERS". (Kinggo, Robert) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Village Capital & Investment, LLC (Kinggo, Robert) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Village Capital & Investment, LLC. (Kinggo, Robert) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Village Capital & Investment, LLC (Kinggo, Robert) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendants Village Capital & Investment, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration System aka "MERS". Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #1 Notice of Removal, (Kinggo, Robert) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Error directed to: Robert J. Kinggo, III re #1 Notice of Removal,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SKra) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Village Capital & Investment, LLC from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 20-002536-CH. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7686458 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Kinggo, Robert) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less