This case was last updated from PACER on 02/25/2020 at 08:11:01 (UTC).

VASSER v. WRIGHT et al

Case Summary

On 12/27/2019 VASSER filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against WRIGHT. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY and LACEY A COLLIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-05091

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY

Presiding Judge

LACEY A COLLIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Defendant

CHRISTOPHER VASSER

Milton, FL 32583

Defendants

R TIFFT

D ALDRIDGE

R WRIGHT

CHRISTOPHER VASSER

Milton, FL 32583

TURNER

B STEARNS

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Mail Returned as Undeliverable/No mail receptacle. Mail sent to CHRISTOPHER VASSER Re: #4 ORDER GRANTING #2 LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. (alb) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER GRANTING #2 LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. The court will not assess Plaintiff an initial partial filing fee. The clerk is directed to MAIL a copy of this order, with the appropriate cover letter to: Santa Rosa County Jail, Attention: Stephanie Barlow, Programs Department, P.O. Box 7129, Milton, FL 32572. (Order and letter mailed.)Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 01/30/2020. (alb) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#6

(#6) Mail Returned as Undeliverable/ released. Mail sent to CHRISTOPHER VASSER Re: #4 ORDER GRANTING #2 LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. (Mail forwarded to 5955 Pineywoods Pl., Milton, FL. 32570. Address given upon release from jail.) (alb) Modified on 2/19/2020 to correct typo error (alb). (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#7

(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable/released 1/17/2020. Mail sent to CHRISTOPHER VASSER Re: #5 ORDER. (mail forwarded 5955 Pineywoods Pl., Milton, FL. 32570. And deadline reset.) (alb) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by CHRISTOPHER VASSER. (alb) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER. The clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a civil rights complaint form for use by prisoners. Within THIRTY DAYS from the date of docketing of this order, Plaintiff must file an amended civil rights complaint. (Order and form mailed.) ( Amended Pleadings due by 2/29/2020.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 01/30/2020. (alb) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against D ALDRIDGE, B STEARNS, R TIFFT, TURNER, R WRIGHT, filed by CHRISTOPHER VASSER. (No service copies.) (alb) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #8 Mail Returned undelivered/no mail receptacle. (alb) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Mail Returned as Undeliverable/No mail receptacle. Mail sent to CHRISTOPHER VASSER Re: #4 ORDER GRANTING #2 LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. (alb) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable/released 1/17/2020. Mail sent to CHRISTOPHER VASSER Re: #5 ORDER. (mail forwarded 5955 Pineywoods Pl., Milton, FL. 32570. And deadline reset.) (alb) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Mail Returned as Undeliverable/ released. Mail sent to CHRISTOPHER VASSER Re: #4 ORDER GRANTING #2 LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. (Mail forwarded to 5955 Pineywoods Pl., Milton, FL. 32570. Address given upon release from jail.) (alb) Modified on 2/19/2020 to correct typo error (alb). (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER. The clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a civil rights complaint form for use by prisoners. Within THIRTY DAYS from the date of docketing of this order, Plaintiff must file an amended civil rights complaint. (Order and form mailed.) ( Amended Pleadings due by 2/29/2020.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 01/30/2020. (alb) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER GRANTING #2 LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. The court will not assess Plaintiff an initial partial filing fee. The clerk is directed to MAIL a copy of this order, with the appropriate cover letter to: Santa Rosa County Jail, Attention: Stephanie Barlow, Programs Department, P.O. Box 7129, Milton, FL 32572. (Order and letter mailed.)Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 01/30/2020. (alb) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (alb) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • Docket(#3) Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by CHRISTOPHER VASSER. (alb) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against D ALDRIDGE, B STEARNS, R TIFFT, TURNER, R WRIGHT, filed by CHRISTOPHER VASSER. (No service copies.) (alb) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.