This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:41:10 (UTC).

Chiddo v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Chiddo filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Bruce E. Reinhart and Robin L. Rosenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:20-CV-80012

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Bruce E. Reinhart

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Chiddo

Defendant and Respondent

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Carroll Klugh, Jr.

25 Se 2Nd Avenue, Suite 1100

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorney

Noticing 2255 US Attorney

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER OF REFERENCE to United States Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for all non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation for any dispositive issues. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) MOTION (Complaint) to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence (2255) . NOTE: All further docketing is to be done in the civil case. (Criminal Case # 15-80077), filed by David Chiddo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Klugh, Richard) Modified text on 1/7/2020 (kpe). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER Requiring Respondent to File Answer, (Answer due by 3/27/2020, Replies due by 4/27/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 1/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Requiring Respondent to File Answer, (Answer due by 3/27/2020, Replies due by 4/27/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 1/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER OF REFERENCE to United States Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for all non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation for any dispositive issues. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (kpe) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION (Complaint) to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence (2255) . NOTE: All further docketing is to be done in the civil case. (Criminal Case # 15-80077), filed by David Chiddo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Klugh, Richard) Modified text on 1/7/2020 (kpe). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.