This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/04/2020 at 15:12:47 (UTC).

Financial Pacific Insurance Company v. United States Fire Insurance Company, et al

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 Financial Pacific Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against United States Fire Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alicia G. Rosenberg and Philip S. Gutierrez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-07938

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

Presiding Judge

Philip S. Gutierrez

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Financial Pacific Insurance Company

Defendants, Counter Claimants and Counter Defendants

United States Fire Insurance Company

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Financial Pacific Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

David S Blau

Attorney at Blau Keane Law Group PC

128 Center Street

El Segundo, CA 90245

Ron L Nelson

Attorney at Blau Keane Law Group, PC

128 Center Street

El Segundo, CA 90245

Defendant, Counter Claimant and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Michael W Goodin

Attorney at Clausen Miller PC

17901 Von Karman Suite 650

Irvine, CA 92614

Daniel Pickett

Attorney at Kennedys CMK LLP

120 Mountain View Boulevard

Basking Ridge, NJ 07920

Kristin V Gallagher

Attorney at Kennedys CMK LLP

120 Mountain View Boulevard

Basking Ridge, NJ 07920

Scott P Ward

Attorney at Clausen Miller PC

17901 Von Karman Avenue Suite 650

Irvine, CA 92614

David S Blau

Attorney at Blau Keane Law Group PC

128 Center Street

El Segundo, CA 90245

Ron L Nelson

Attorney at Blau Keane Law Group, PC

128 Center Street

El Segundo, CA 90245

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Answer to Counterclaim, #12 #27 filed by Counter Claimant United States Fire Insurance Company. (Attorney Scott P Ward added to party United States Fire Insurance Company(pty:cc))(Ward, Scott) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#29

(#29) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Scott P Ward on behalf of Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company (Attorney Scott P Ward added to party United States Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Ward, Scott) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

27 #5

Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Leave to Amend Defendant/Cou

27 #4

Unredacted Document Second Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant

27 #3

Redacted Document Redacted Second Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Def

27 #2

Declaration Declaration of Michael W. Goodin in Support of Motion for Leave to A

27 #1

Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion for Leave t

#27

(#27) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Answer to Counterclaim, #12 filed by Defendant/Counterclaimant United States Fire Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 3/16/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Defendant/Counterclaimant United States Fire Insurance Company's Answer and Counterclaim, #2 Declaration Declaration of Michael W. Goodin in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Defendant/Counterclaimant United States Fire Insurance Company's Answer and Counterclaim, #3 Redacted Document Redacted Second Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company with Amended Counterclaim for Declaratory Relief and Equitable Subrogation, #4 Unredacted Document Second Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company with Amended Counterclaim for Declaratory Relief and Equitable Subrogation, #5 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Leave to Amend Defendant/Counterclaimant United States Fire Insurance Company's Answer and Counterclaim) (Goodin, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#12

(#21) ANSWER to Answer to Counterclaim, #12 filed by Counter Defendant Financial Pacific Insurance Company.(Nelson, Ron) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (esa) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#2

(#2) AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company. Amendment to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Amended Certificate of Service (Goodin, Michael) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

1 #5

Notice of No Related Cases

1 #4

Notice of Interested Parties

1 #3

Declaration

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Complaint

#1

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on September 17, 2019. (Goodin, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Answer to Counterclaim, #12 #27 filed by Counter Claimant United States Fire Insurance Company. (Attorney Scott P Ward added to party United States Fire Insurance Company(pty:cc))(Ward, Scott) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Scott P Ward on behalf of Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company (Attorney Scott P Ward added to party United States Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Ward, Scott) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) FINANCIAL PACIFIC INSURANCE COMPANYS OPPOSITION TO UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANYS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND IN OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Answer to Counterclaim, #12 #27 filed by Plaintiff Financial Pacific Insurance Company. (Blau, David) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Answer to Counterclaim, #12 filed by Defendant/Counterclaimant United States Fire Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 3/16/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Defendant/Counterclaimant United States Fire Insurance Company's Answer and Counterclaim, #2 Declaration Declaration of Michael W. Goodin in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Defendant/Counterclaimant United States Fire Insurance Company's Answer and Counterclaim, #3 Redacted Document Redacted Second Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company with Amended Counterclaim for Declaratory Relief and Equitable Subrogation, #4 Unredacted Document Second Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company with Amended Counterclaim for Declaratory Relief and Equitable Subrogation, #5 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Leave to Amend Defendant/Counterclaimant United States Fire Insurance Company's Answer and Counterclaim) (Goodin, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Final Pretrial Conference: August 17, 2020 at 2:30 p.m., Jury Trial Date: September 1, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. Defendant(s). UNLESS OTHERWISE ORDERED BY THE COURT, THE FOLLOWING RULES SHALL APPLY: (see document for further details) (bm) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers): VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for hearing on December 16, 2019 is VACATED, and the following dates are hereby set. Please review the Court's trial order for further details. Last Day to Add Parties and Amend Pleadings (Doe defendants are dismissed as of cut-off to add parties): January 16, 2020; Discovery Cut-Off: May 26, 2020; Last Day to File Motion: June 9, 2020; Opening Expert Witness Disclosure [See F.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(2)]; June 2, 2020; Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosure: June 30, 2020; Expert Discovery Cut-Off: July 21, 2020; Final Pretrial Conference (2:30 p.m.): August 17, 2020; Jury Trial (9:00 a.m.): September 1, 2020, Estimated Length: 4 Days. (bm) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than July 2, 2020. (bm) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) REPORT of Parties Planning Meeting filed by Plaintiff Financial Pacific Insurance Company. (Blau, David) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Financial Pacific Insurance Company, identifying United Fire Group, Inc. and United Fire & Casualty Company. (Nelson, Ron) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER to Answer to Counterclaim, #12 filed by Counter Defendant Financial Pacific Insurance Company.(Nelson, Ron) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on September 17, 2019. (Goodin, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kristin V. Gallagher. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Daniel Pickett. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): The Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Interested Parties and Notice of Related Cases are attached to the Notice of Removal. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (esa) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (esa) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company. Amendment to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Amended Certificate of Service (Goodin, Michael) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, United States Fire Insurance Company, filed by plaintiff Financial Pacific Insurance Company. (filed in stated court 7/31/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 19STCV26859 Receipt No: 0973-24431012 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Declaration, #4 Notice of Interested Parties, #5 Notice of No Related Cases) (Attorney Michael W Goodin added to party United States Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Goodin, Michael) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FINANCIAL PACIFIC INSURANCE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant