This case was last updated from PACER on 08/28/2020 at 12:21:56 (UTC).

RUBIO v. UNITED STATES

Case Summary

On 06/29/2020 RUBIO filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against UNITED STATES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Tanya S. Chutkan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01757

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya S. Chutkan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Not Classified By Court

CHRIS RUBIO

UNITED STATES

Defendant and Not Classified By Court

UNITED STATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John B. Wells

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOHN B. WELLS

P.O. Box 5235

Slidell, LA 70469

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Case transferred to the USDC for the Eastern District of Louisiana, pursuant to the Court Order entered 7/11/2020. Sent to Court via Extraction. (ztd) (ztd). (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting Motion to Transfer Case #4 . Transferring case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/11/2020. (DJS) (Entered: 07/11/2020)

#5

(#5) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by CHRIS RUBIO re Order,,, filed by CHRIS RUBIO. (Wells, John) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

(#4) Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Louisiana by CHRIS RUBIO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wells, John) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#3

(#3) Case randomly reassigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

2 #1

Notice and Consent

#2

(#2) SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CHRIS RUBIO (Filing Fee $400 receipt number ADCDC-7279090 ) filed by CHRIS RUBIO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Wells, John) Modified on 7/1/2020 (adh, ). (Entered: 07/01/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketReceipt on 07/21/2020 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 2:20-cv-02071 sent by Eastern District of Louisiana. (zrdj) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred to the USDC for the Eastern District of Louisiana, pursuant to the Court Order entered 7/11/2020. Sent to Court via Extraction. (ztd) (ztd). (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 7/21/2020. (tb) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting Motion to Transfer Case #4 . Transferring case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/11/2020. (DJS) (Entered: 07/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by CHRIS RUBIO re Order,,, filed by CHRIS RUBIO. (Wells, John) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Louisiana by CHRIS RUBIO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wells, John) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 7/10/2020. (tb) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff, who resides in Louisiana, brings claims pursuant to the Federal Tort Claims Act for incidents that occurred during medical treatment at a Veteran's hospital in Puerto Rico. By 7/10/2020, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice for lack of venue. See Harrison v. Lappin, No. CIV.A. 04-0681 (JR), 2005 WL 752189, at *4 (D.D.C. Mar. 31, 2005) ("Venue for an FTCA claim exists only where the cause of action arose or where plaintiff resides.") (citing 28 U.S.C. 1402), aff'd, No. 05-5310, 2006 WL 3093804 (D.C. Cir. June 22, 2006) (finding that the district court "properly dismissed appellant's claims under the Federal Tort Claims Act for lack of venue."). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/6/2020. (DJS) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Case randomly reassigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CHRIS RUBIO (Filing Fee $400 receipt number ADCDC-7279090 ) filed by CHRIS RUBIO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Wells, John) Modified on 7/1/2020 (adh, ). (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less