This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:00:24 (UTC).

Hussain v. Pompeo et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Hussain filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Pompeo. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sidney A Fitzwater and Brantley Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02978

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Sidney A Fitzwater

Brantley Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Goran Abdulrahman Hussain

Defendants

United States Department of State

2201 C Street Nw, Room 6811

Washington, DC 20520

United States Citizenship & Immigration Services

425 I Street Nw, Room 6100

Washington, DC 20536

United States Attorney General Northern District of Texas

Dallas, TX 75242-1699

United States Attorney General Department of Justice

United States Department of Homeland Security ("DHS")

245 Murray Lane Sw, Mail Stop 0485

Washington, DC 20528-0485

United States Consul General

United States Embassy Baghdad

Respondents

Chad Wolf

Brian McFeeters

Attorney General William P Barr

Washington, DC 20530-0001

Michael R Pompeo

Ken Cuccinelli

Matthew H Tueller

John Doe

Carl Risch

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

Wendy Renee Whitt

Attorney at Whitt Law Ofices PLLC

3234 Commander Dr

Carrollton, TX 75006

 

Court Documents

#10

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Summons issued as to William P Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, John Doe, Brian McFeeters, Michael R Pompeo, Carl Risch, Matthew H Tueller, Chad Wolf, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (ykp) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Goran Abdulrahman Hussain. (Whitt, Wendy) Modified filer on 2/13/2020 (ykp). (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Goran Abdulrahman Hussain. (Whitt, Wendy) Modified filer on 2/13/2020 (ykp). (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Goran Abdulrahman Hussain. (Whitt, Wendy) Modified filer on 2/13/2020 (ykp). (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Goran Abdulrahman Hussain. (Whitt, Wendy) Modified filer on 2/13/2020 (ykp). (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Goran Abdulrahman Hussain. (Whitt, Wendy) Modified filer on 2/13/2020 (ykp). (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Goran Abdulrahman Hussain. (Whitt, Wendy) Modified filer on 2/13/2020 (ykp). (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Goran Abdulrahman Hussain. (Whitt, Wendy) Modified filer on 2/13/2020 (ykp). (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Goran Abdulrahman Hussain. (Whitt, Wendy) Modified filer on 2/13/2020 (ykp). (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • Judge Brantley Starr reassigned as presiding judge per SO 3-334. Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater no longer assigned to case. (ctf) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cdt) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Petition For Writ of Mandamus filed by Goran Abdulrahman Hussain. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10485603) (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Whitt, Wendy) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.