This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/29/2021 at 08:24:36 (UTC).

Stein v. Town Of Greenburgh et al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Stein filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Town Of Greenburgh. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Philip M. Halpern. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-05673

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip M. Halpern

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kristin Stein

Defendants

Police Officer Brian Doherty

Patrol Captain Frank Farina

Lieutenant Kobie Powell

Sergeant Alex Rodriguez

Police Officer Frank Kozakiewicz

Sergeant Michael Cookingham

Town Of Greenburgh

Police Officer John Pilla

Lieutenant Brian Matthews

Police Officer Dyana Albano

Lieutenant Robert J Gramaglia

Interim Chief of Pol Brian Ryan

Police Officer Jeff Cerone

Sergeant Patrick T. Grady

Chief of Police Chris McNerney

Sergeant Eric Vlasaty

Interim Chief Brian Ryan

Sergeant Dennis Basulto

Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider

Sgt. & Lt. Dennis Basulto

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Denise M. Cossu

Attorney at Murtagh, Cossu, Venditti & Castro-Blanco LLP

1133 Westchester Ave./N202, Suite N-202

White Plains, NY 10604

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony George Piscionere

Attorney at Piscionere & Nemarow

363 Boston Post Road

Rye, NY 10580

Timothy W. Lewis

Attorney at Town of Greenburgh, Office of Town Attorneys

177 Hillside Avenue

Greenburgh, NY 10607

Thomas J. Marcoline

Attorney at Law Office of Vincent Toomey

3000 Marcus Avenue, Suite 1W10

Lake Success, NY 11042

David Ross Fried

Attorney at Town of Greenburgh, Office of Town Attorneys

177 Hillside Avenue

Greenburgh, NY 10607

 

Court Documents

#35

#34

#33

#32

#31

#30

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER granting #34 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. The time for defendants to answer or otherwise move with respect to the Complaint is extended to 9/27/2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 8/19/2021) (tg) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Move or Answer the Complaint addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Thomas J. Marcoline dated August 18, 2021. Document filed by Frank Farina, Frank Farina, Chris McNerney, Chris Mcnerney, Kobie Powell, Kobie Powell, Brian Ryan, Brian Ryan, Town Of Greenburgh..(Marcoline, Thomas) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas J. Marcoline on behalf of Frank Farina, Frank Farina, Chris McNerney, Chris Mcnerney, Kobie Powell, Kobie Powell, Brian Ryan, Brian Ryan, Town Of Greenburgh..(Marcoline, Thomas) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas J. Marcoline on behalf of Frank Farina, Chris McNerney, Kobie Powell, Brian Ryan, Town Of Greenburgh..(Marcoline, Thomas) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER granting #30 Letter Motion for Extension of Time; granting #30 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #30 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time To answer or move addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Anthony G. Piscionere dated August 16, 2021.SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or move addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Anthony G. Piscionere dated August 16, 2021., #3 Complaint. Application granted. The time for defendants listed herein to answer or otherwise move with respect to the complaint is extended to 9/27/2021. Dyana Albano answer due 9/27/2021; Dyana Albano answer due 9/27/2021; Dennis Basulto answer due 9/27/2021; Dennis Basulto(In his official capacity as Lieutenant ) answer due 9/27/2021; Dennis Basulto (Individually ) answer due 9/27/2021; Jeff Cerone answer due 9/27/2021; Jeff Cerone answer due 9/27/2021; Michael Cookingham answer due 9/27/2021; Michael Cookingham answer due 9/27/2021; Brian Doherty answer due 9/27/2021; Brian Doherty answer due 9/27/2021; Frank Farina answer due 9/27/2021; Frank Farina answer due 9/27/2021; Patrick T. Grady answer due 9/27/2021; Patrick T Grady answer due 9/27/2021; Robert J Gramaglia answer due 9/27/2021; Robert J Gramaglia answer due 9/27/2021; Frank Kozakiewicz answer due 9/27/2021; Frank Kozakiewicz answer due 9/27/2021; Brian Matthews answer due 9/27/2021; Brian Matthews answer due 9/27/2021; Chris McNerney answer due 9/27/2021; Chris Mcnerney answer due 9/27/2021; John Pilla answer due 9/27/2021; John Pilla answer due 9/27/2021; Kobie Powell answer due 9/27/2021; Kobie Powell answer due 9/27/2021; Alex Rodriguez answer due 9/27/2021; Alex Rodriguez answer due 9/27/2021; Brian Ryan answer due 9/27/2021; Brian Ryan answer due 9/27/2021; Town Of Greenburgh answer due 9/27/2021; Eric Vlasaty answer due 9/27/2021; Eric Vlasaty answer due 9/27/2021. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 8/17/2021) (ate) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time To answer or move addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Anthony G. Piscionere dated August 16, 2021., SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or move addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Anthony G. Piscionere dated August 16, 2021. Document filed by Dyana Albano, Dyana Albano, Dennis Basulto, Dennis Basulto(In his official capacity as Lieutenant ), Dennis Basulto (Individually ), Jeff Cerone, Jeff Cerone, Michael Cookingham, Michael Cookingham, Brian Doherty, Brian Doherty, Patrick T. Grady, Patrick T Grady, Robert J Gramaglia, Robert J Gramaglia, Frank Kozakiewicz, Frank Kozakiewicz, Brian Matthews, Brian Matthews, John Pilla, John Pilla, Alex Rodriguez, Alex Rodriguez, Eric Vlasaty, Eric Vlasaty..(Piscionere, Anthony) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony George Piscionere on behalf of Dyana Albano, Dyana Albano, Dennis Basulto, Dennis Basulto(In his official capacity as Lieutenant ), Dennis Basulto (Individually ), Jeff Cerone, Jeff Cerone, Michael Cookingham, Michael Cookingham, Brian Doherty, Brian Doherty, Patrick T. Grady, Patrick T Grady, Robert J Gramaglia, Robert J Gramaglia, Frank Kozakiewicz, Frank Kozakiewicz, Brian Matthews, Brian Matthews, John Pilla, John Pilla, Alex Rodriguez, Alex Rodriguez, Eric Vlasaty, Eric Vlasaty..(Piscionere, Anthony) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER granting #27 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #27 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Timothy W. Lewis dated July 21, 2021., #3 Complaint. Application granted. The time for defendants to answer or otherwise move with respect to the Complaint is extended to 8/30/2021. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 7/21/2021) (rro) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Timothy W. Lewis dated July 21, 2021. Document filed by Dyana Albano, Dyana Albano, Dennis Basulto, Dennis Basulto(In his official capacity as Lieutenant ), Dennis Basulto (Individually ), Jeff Cerone, Jeff Cerone, Michael Cookingham, Michael Cookingham, Brian Doherty, Brian Doherty, Frank Farina, Frank Farina, Patrick T. Grady, Patrick T Grady, Robert J Gramaglia, Robert J Gramaglia, Frank Kozakiewicz, Frank Kozakiewicz, Brian Matthews, Brian Matthews, Chris McNerney, Chris Mcnerney, John Pilla, John Pilla, Kobie Powell, Kobie Powell, Alex Rodriguez, Alex Rodriguez, Brian Ryan, Brian Ryan, Town Of Greenburgh, Eric Vlasaty, Eric Vlasaty..(Lewis, Timothy) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy W. Lewis on behalf of Dyana Albano, Dyana Albano, Dennis Basulto, Dennis Basulto(In his official capacity as Lieutenant ), Dennis Basulto (Individually ), Jeff Cerone, Jeff Cerone, Michael Cookingham, Michael Cookingham, Brian Doherty, Brian Doherty, Frank Farina, Frank Farina, Patrick T. Grady, Patrick T Grady, Robert J Gramaglia, Robert J Gramaglia, Frank Kozakiewicz, Frank Kozakiewicz, Brian Matthews, Brian Matthews, Chris McNerney, Chris Mcnerney, John Pilla, John Pilla, Kobie Powell, Kobie Powell, Alex Rodriguez, Alex Rodriguez, Brian Ryan, Brian Ryan, Town Of Greenburgh, Eric Vlasaty, Eric Vlasaty..(Lewis, Timothy) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Denise M. Cossu. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 42:2000; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 42:1983; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Denise M. Cossu to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): multiple Nature of Suit codes were selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Denise M. Cossu re: Document No. #3 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add parties Brian Ryan, Chris McNerney, Robert J. Gramaglia, Kobie Powell, Brian Matthews, Frank Farina, Dennis Basulto, Eric Vlasaty, Patrict T. Grady, Michael Cookingham, Alex Rodriguez, Jeff Cerone, John Pilla, Brian Doherty, Dyana Albano and Frank Kozakiewicz each in their individual capacity, and add party Dennis Basulto in his official capacity as Lieutenant. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (jgo) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Dyana Albano, Dennis Basulto, Jeff Cerone, Michael Cookingham, Brian Doherty, Frank Farina, Patrick T. Grady, Robert J Gramaglia, Frank Kozakiewicz, Brian Matthews, Chris McNerney, John Pilla, Kobie Powell, Alex Rodriguez, Brian Ryan, Town Of Greenburgh, Eric Vlasaty. Document filed by Kristin Stein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Letter, #2 Exhibit Right to Sue Letter).(Cossu, Denise) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/1/2021) (gp). (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Kristin Stein added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Kristin Stein. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Cossu, Denise) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cossu, Denise) Modified on 7/1/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Dyana Albano, Dennis Basulto, Jeff Cerone, Michael Cookingham, Brian Doherty, Frank Farina, Patrick T. Grady, Robert J Gramaglia, Frank Kozakiewicz, Brian Matthews, Chris McNerney, John Pilla, Kobie Powell, Alex Rodriguez, Brian Ryan, Town Of Greenburgh, Eric Vlasaty. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24739407)Document filed by Kristin Stein..(Cossu, Denise) Modified on 7/1/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Denise M. Cossu