This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/12/2021 at 11:08:00 (UTC).

Bao v. Sunwoo Trade Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 Bao filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Sunwoo Trade Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cathy Seibel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-09588

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cathy Seibel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shuzhong Bao

Defendants, Counter Claimants and Counter Defendants

Sunwoo Trade Inc.

YIFEN BAO

XUGUANG WANG

Jason Wang

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yong Chen

Attorney at Liu, Chen & Hoffman LLP

1 Penn Plz, Ste 2508

New York, NY 10119

Defendant, Counter Claimant and Counter Defendant Attorney

Richard Ben Stone

Attorney at Stone Mandia, LLC

685 Neptune Boulevard

Neptune, NJ 07754

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties herein shall appear in a telephone conference for the purpose of case management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 on March 18, 2021 at 4:30 p.m. (via telephone). Person(s) appearing via telephone are reminded of the general prohibition against any forms of recording and rebroadcasting of Court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Pursuant to Judge Seibels Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in light of COVID-19, last revised on March 19, 2020, the parties are directed to attend by phone using the following information: Toll-Free Tele-conference number: (877) 336 1839 to call in and enter access code: 1047966#. The parties should call in from a landline phone (if possible), announce their last name(s) before addressing the Court at any time during the call, and mute their lines (pressing *6 on phone) when not speaking. Initial Conference set for 3/18/2021 at 04:30 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel. Telephone Conference set for 3/18/2021 at 04:30 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel. (mml) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Sunwoo Trade Inc.. Document filed by Sunwoo Trade Inc...(Stone, Richard) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Sunwoo Trade Inc...(Stone, Richard) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference Request for Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Richard B. Stone, Esq. dated December 16, 2020., THIRD LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Richard B. Stone, Esq. dated December 16, 2020. Document filed by Xuguang Wang..(Stone, Richard) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yifen Bao, Sunwoo Trade Inc., Xuguang Wang. (sj) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Yong Chen. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 29:206; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:201; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SUNWOO TRADE INC., XUGUANG WANG a/k/a JASON WANG, and YIFEN BAO, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Shuzhong Bao..(Chen, Yong) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Chen, Yong) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-22624345, paid on 11/17/2020..(gp) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against YIFEN BAO, Sunwoo Trade Inc., XUGUANG WANG. Document filed by Shuzhong Bao..(Chen, Yong) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Yong Chen to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 11/23/2020. (sj) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yong Chen