This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/28/2022 at 14:53:38 (UTC).

Egleston v Snohomish County et al

Case Summary

On 12/03/2021 Egleston filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Snohomish County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Marsha J. Pechman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01630

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marsha J. Pechman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Valerie Egleston

Defendants

Snohomish County

Adam Fortney

Anthony Zayas

Brent Reid

Jonathan Krajcar

Sara Miller

Joshua Wheeler

Darian Willis

Mount Vernon, WA 98273

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Michael T Mumford

Attorney at BURI FUNSTON MUMFORD

1601 F St

Bellingham, WA 98225

Deborah A Severson

Attorney at SNOHOMISH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY (CIVIL)

3000 Rockefeller Avenue, M/S 504

Everett, WA 98201-4046

Katherine H Bosch

Attorney at SNOHOMISH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY (CIVIL)

3000 Rockefeller Avenue, M/S 504

Everett, WA 98201-4046

Shannon M Ragonesi

Attorney at KEATING BUCKLIN MCCORMACK INC PS

801 Second Avenue, Suite 1210

Seattle, WA 98104

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Shannon M Ragonesi for Defendant Anthony Zayas from 05/31/22 - 06/09/22. (Ragonesi, Shannon) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#19

(#19) ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint by Adam Fortney, Jonathan Krajcar, Sara Miller, Brent Reid, Snohomish County, Joshua Wheeler, Darian Willis.(Bosch, Katherine) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#18

(#18) ORDER re Parties' #17 Agreed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint for Damages. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#17

(#17) Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint for Damages, filed by Plaintiff Valerie Egleston. Noting Date 3/28/2022, (Mumford, Michael) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#16

(#16) AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Jonathan Krajcar, Sara Miller, Brent Reid, Snohomish County, Joshua Wheeler, Darian Willis, Anthony Zayas, filed by Valerie Egleston.(Mumford, Michael) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#15

(#15) ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *15 Days*. Jury Trial is set for 10/10/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Joinder of Parties due by 3/18/2022, Amended Pleadings due by 3/28/2022, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/14/2023, Motions due by 4/13/2023, Discovery completed by 5/15/2023, Dispositive motions due by 6/12/2023, Motions in Limine due by 9/5/2023, Pretrial Order due by 9/26/2023, Trial briefs to be submitted by 9/26/2023, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 9/26/2023, Pretrial Conference set for 9/28/2023 at 10:30 AM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#14

(#14) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 15. (Bosch, Katherine) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/14/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/31/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/7/2022. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#12

(#12) VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Defendants Adam Fortney, Jonathan Krajcar, Sara Miller, Brent Reid, Snohomish County, Joshua Wheeler, Darian Willis (Bosch, Katherine) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katherine H Bosch on behalf of Defendants Adam Fortney, Jonathan Krajcar, Sara Miller, Brent Reid, Snohomish County, Joshua Wheeler, Darian Willis. (Bosch, Katherine) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Deborah A Severson on behalf of Defendants Adam Fortney, Jonathan Krajcar, Sara Miller, Brent Reid, Snohomish County, Joshua Wheeler. (Severson, Deborah) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#5

(#5) Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. (Ad Hoc: Deborah A Severson) (ST) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#4

(#4) LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (Ad Hoc: Deborah A Severson) (ST) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE to Plaintiff of Removal ; filed by Defendants Adam Fortney, Jonathan Krajcar, Sara Miller, Brent Reid, Snohomish County, Joshua Wheeler. (Bosch, Katherine) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#2

(#2) AFFIDAVIT re #1 Notice of Removal,, re. Notice to King County Superior Court and Counsel for Plaintiff filed by Defendants Adam Fortney, Jonathan Krajcar, Sara Miller, Brent Reid, Snohomish County, Joshua Wheeler (Bosch, Katherine) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

1 #2

Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Shannon M Ragonesi for Defendant Anthony Zayas from 05/31/22 - 06/09/22. (Ragonesi, Shannon) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint by Adam Fortney, Jonathan Krajcar, Sara Miller, Brent Reid, Snohomish County, Joshua Wheeler, Darian Willis.(Bosch, Katherine) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER re Parties' #17 Agreed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint for Damages. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint for Damages, filed by Plaintiff Valerie Egleston. Noting Date 3/28/2022, (Mumford, Michael) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Jonathan Krajcar, Sara Miller, Brent Reid, Snohomish County, Joshua Wheeler, Darian Willis, Anthony Zayas, filed by Valerie Egleston.(Mumford, Michael) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *15 Days*. Jury Trial is set for 10/10/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Joinder of Parties due by 3/18/2022, Amended Pleadings due by 3/28/2022, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/14/2023, Motions due by 4/13/2023, Discovery completed by 5/15/2023, Dispositive motions due by 6/12/2023, Motions in Limine due by 9/5/2023, Pretrial Order due by 9/26/2023, Trial briefs to be submitted by 9/26/2023, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 9/26/2023, Pretrial Conference set for 9/28/2023 at 10:30 AM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 15. (Bosch, Katherine) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/14/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/31/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/7/2022. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Defendants Adam Fortney, Jonathan Krajcar, Sara Miller, Brent Reid, Snohomish County, Joshua Wheeler, Darian Willis (Bosch, Katherine) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Anthony Zayas.(Ragonesi, Shannon) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE Jury Demand ; filed by Plaintiff Valerie Egleston. (Mumford, Michael) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Darian Willis mailed on 12/7/2021 (Bosch, Katherine) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katherine H Bosch on behalf of Defendants Adam Fortney, Jonathan Krajcar, Sara Miller, Brent Reid, Snohomish County, Joshua Wheeler, Darian Willis. (Bosch, Katherine) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Deborah A Severson on behalf of Defendants Adam Fortney, Jonathan Krajcar, Sara Miller, Brent Reid, Snohomish County, Joshua Wheeler. (Severson, Deborah) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. (Ad Hoc: Deborah A Severson) (ST) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (Ad Hoc: Deborah A Severson) (ST) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketJudge Marsha J. Pechman added. (Ad Hoc: Deborah A Severson) (ST) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE to Plaintiff of Removal ; filed by Defendants Adam Fortney, Jonathan Krajcar, Sara Miller, Brent Reid, Snohomish County, Joshua Wheeler. (Bosch, Katherine) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT re #1 Notice of Removal,, re. Notice to King County Superior Court and Counsel for Plaintiff filed by Defendants Adam Fortney, Jonathan Krajcar, Sara Miller, Brent Reid, Snohomish County, Joshua Wheeler (Bosch, Katherine) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 21-2-15486-3 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7356903) Attorney Michael T Mumford added to party Adam Fortney(pty:dft), Attorney Michael T Mumford added to party Jonathan Krajcar(pty:dft), Attorney Michael T Mumford added to party Sara Miller(pty:dft), Attorney Michael T Mumford added to party Brent Reid(pty:dft), Attorney Michael T Mumford added to party Snohomish County(pty:dft), Attorney Michael T Mumford added to party Joshua Wheeler(pty:dft), filed by Brent Reid, Jonathan Krajcar, Sara Miller, Adam Fortney, Snohomish County, Joshua Wheeler, Valerie Egleston. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Bosch, Katherine) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SNOHOMISH COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael T Mumford

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine Heather Bosch

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Deborah A. Severson