This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/28/2021 at 12:13:50 (UTC).

SHARP v. JAMES et al

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 SHARP filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JAMES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is TILMAN E SELF, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00490

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TILMAN E SELF, III

 

Party Details

Defendants and Plaintiffs

RIKKI SHARP

UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

CHEROKEE INSURANCE COMPANY

GWENDOLYN JAMES

LAWRENCE GROSS

ESTES EXPRESS LINES, INC.

BP EXPRESS, LLC D/B/A BPX LOGISTICS LLC

LAWRENCE R GROSS

BP EXPRESS LLC doing business as BPX LOGISTICS LLC

ESTES EXPRESS LINES INC

3Rd Party Defendant and Counter Claimant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bradley J. Survant

P.O. Box 26610

Macon, GA 31221-6610

Oliver Wendell Horne, III

Po Box 26610

Macon, GA 31221-6610

Defendant Attorneys

JASON S STEWART

900 Circle 75 Pkwy Ste 1400

Atlanta, GA 30339

GRANT B SMITH

Attorney at Dennis, Corry, Smith & Dixon

900 Circle 75 Parkway, Suite 1400

Atlanta, GA 30339

Jason Guy Wyrick

Attorney at MERIDIAN II STE 2000

275 Scientific Dr

Norcross, GA 30092

Joseph Robb Cruser

275 Scientific Dr, Ste 2000

Peachtree Corners, GA 30092

CANDICE RENEE BRYANT

Meridian Ii, Suite 2000, 275 Scientific Dr

Norcross, GA 30092

3Rd Party Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

DANNAH G RODRIGUEZ

300 Mulberry St, Ste 503

Macon, GA 31201

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

8 #1

Required Form

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Express Consent to Electronic Service by ESTES EXPRESS LINES INC, GWENDOLYN JAMES (STEWART, JASON) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER:Discovery to be complete by 8/2/2021. Dispositive motions due by 9/1/2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 02/03/2021. (vs) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #13 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ESTES EXPRESS LINES INC, UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, GWENDOLYN JAMES ); Document must be re-filed to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case. Prior to refiling, please refer to Page 12 of the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Filing and contact our office with questions.(mdm) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #15 Notice of Attorney Appearance, filed by CHEROKEE INSURANCE COMPANY, LAWRENCE R GROSS, BP EXPRESS LLC ); Notice to Counsel - Jason Wyrick - Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER.(bcl) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Guy Wyrick on behalf of BP EXPRESS LLC, CHEROKEE INSURANCE COMPANY, LAWRENCE R GROSS Attorney Jason Guy Wyrick added to party BP EXPRESS LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Guy Wyrick added to party CHEROKEE INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Guy Wyrick added to party LAWRENCE R GROSS(pty:dft)(Wyrick, Jason) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ESTES EXPRESS LINES INC, GWENDOLYN JAMES, UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (STEWART, JASON) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ESTES EXPRESS LINES INC, GWENDOLYN JAMES, UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (STEWART, JASON) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation, Corporate Parent BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY INC., Corporate Parent GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY for GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (RODRIGUEZ, DANNAH) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ); Document must be re-filed to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case.(vs) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (RODRIGUEZ, DANNAH) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP EXPRESS LLC identifying Corporate Parent BPE MIDCO LLC, Corporate Parent BPE HOLDINGS LLC, Other Affiliate SMARTDRIVE LEASING, Other Affiliate BPX LOGISTICS LLC for BP EXPRESS LLC. (BRYANT, CANDICE) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHEROKEE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent OAKLAND FINANCIAL CORPORATION for CHEROKEE INSURANCE COMPANY. (BRYANT, CANDICE) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by CHEROKEE INSURANCE COMPANY, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by BP EXPRESS LLC ); Document must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and re-filed.(vs) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP EXPRESS LLC identifying Corporate Parent BPE MIDCO, LLC, Corporate Parent BPE HOLDINGS, LLC, Other Affiliate BPX LOGISTICS, LLC, Other Affiliate SMARTDRIVE LEASING for BP EXPRESS LLC. (BRYANT, CANDICE) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHEROKEE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent OAKLAND FINANCIAL CORPORATION for CHEROKEE INSURANCE COMPANY. (BRYANT, CANDICE) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency - Notice to Counsel: DANNAH G. RODRIGUEZ, your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER.(mdm) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ESTES EXPRESS LINES INC, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY ). Document must be re-filed to add corporate parents, subsidiary corporations and/or any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock to the case.(mdm) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (STEWART, JASON) Modified on 12/31/2020 to edit docket text. (mdm) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ESTES EXPRESS LINES, INC. (STEWART, JASON) Modified on 12/31/2020 to edit docket text.(mdm) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL against ESTES EXPRESS LINES, INC., GWENDOLYN JAMES, BP EXPRESS, LLC D/B/A BPX LOGISTICS LLC Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3669091, $402 filed by UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, ESTES EXPRESS LINES, INC., GWENDOLYN JAMES (Attachments: #1 Bibb County State Court Documents, #2 Sheriff's Entry of Service)(STEWART, JASON) Modified on 12/31/2020 to edit docket text. (mdm) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BP EXPRESS, LLC D/B/A BPX LOGISTICS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Cherokee Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Estes Express Lines, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant