This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2020 at 08:43:32 (UTC).

5650 N. Miami Ave., LLC et al v. Scottsdale Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 5650 N Miami Ave , LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Scottsdale Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cecilia M. Altonaga. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-23977

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cecilia M. Altonaga

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

55 N.E. 59 Street, LLC

5650 N. Miami Ave., LLC

Scottsdale Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ely Robert Levy

Attorney at Levy & Partners, PLLC

3230 Stirling Road, Suite 1

Hollywood, FL 33021

Jack Benmeleh

Attorney at Militzok & Levy

3230 Stirling Rd

Hollywood, FL 33021

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph Richard Miele, Jr.

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP

100 S.E. Third Avenue, Suite 1500

Ft.Lauderdale, FL 33394

Kristine Theresa DeSoiza

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich , Voluck, LLP

100 Se Third Avenue, Suite 1500

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33394

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #10 Transmittal Letter Sent, #9 Order Remanding Case to State Court (cds) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

10 #1

Order of Remand

#10

(#10) Transmittal Letter Sent with Order of Remand to: 11th Judicial Circuit in and for Miami-Dade County, Florida. State Court Case Number: 2020-014024-CA-01 (Attachments: #1 Order of Remand) (mee) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER OF REMAND. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Scottsdale Insurance Company OF CONSENT TO REMAND (Miele, Joseph) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER that Defendant, Scottsdale Insurance Company, shall file an amended notice of removal indicating the citizenship of Plaintiffs, 5650 N. Miami Ave., LLC, and 55 N.E. 59 Street, LLC, no later than October 5, 2020, failing which the case will be remanded to the Circuit Court for the Eleventh Circuit in and for Miami-Dade County. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 10/9/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER. Removal Status Report due by 10/9/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - for Damages) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13604510, filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miele, Joseph) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #10 Transmittal Letter Sent, #9 Order Remanding Case to State Court (cds) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. per DE #9 Closing Case. (mr1) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Transmittal Letter Sent with Order of Remand to: 11th Judicial Circuit in and for Miami-Dade County, Florida. State Court Case Number: 2020-014024-CA-01 (Attachments: #1 Order of Remand) (mee) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER OF REMAND. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Scottsdale Insurance Company OF CONSENT TO REMAND (Miele, Joseph) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER that Defendant, Scottsdale Insurance Company, shall file an amended notice of removal indicating the citizenship of Plaintiffs, 5650 N. Miami Ave., LLC, and 55 N.E. 59 Street, LLC, no later than October 5, 2020, failing which the case will be remanded to the Circuit Court for the Eleventh Circuit in and for Miami-Dade County. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 10/9/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER. Removal Status Report due by 10/9/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • Docket(#4) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect Party Role Selected. The Filer failed to select the correct party role. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (bb) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect case opening information. The Filer selected the incorrect Origin when filing. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (bb) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - for Damages) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13604510, filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miele, Joseph) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 55 NE 59 Street LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Scottsdale Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph R. Miele