This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/05/2022 at 08:12:46 (UTC).

SOLAS OLED LTD. v. Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 SOLAS OLED LTD filed an Other lawsuit against Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Virginia K. DeMarchi. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-MC-80005

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia K. DeMarchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOLAS OLED LTD.

Defendants

Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd.

Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Respondent

Apple Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Christine E. Lehman

Attorney at Reichman Jorgensen Lehman & Feldberg LLP

1710 Rhode Island Avenue, Nw12Th Floor

Washington, DC 20036

Taylor Nowell Mauze

Attorney at Reichman Jorgensen Lehman and Feldberg LLP

13419 Crystal Avenue

Austin, TX 78737

Jennifer Prieb Estremera

Attorney at Reichman Jorgensen Lehman & Feldberg LLP

100 Marine Parkway, Suite 300

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Respondent Attorneys

Hannah Cannom

Attorney at Walker Stevens Cannom LLP

500 Molino Streetsuite 118

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Bethany Marvin Stevens

Attorney at Walker Stevens Cannom LLP

500 Molino Street #118

Los Angeles, CA 90013

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER Granting Motion to Compel Production of Source Code. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 2/11/2022. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2022) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#15

(#15) Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #11 Motion to Expedite Hearing on Motion to Compel #1 and Denying Motion to Transfer. Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2022) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

14 #3

Proposed Order

14 #2

Exhibit A to Stevens Declaration

14 #1

Declaration of Bethany Stevens

14 #14

Main Document

13 #1

Proposed Order

13 #13

Main Document

#11

(#11) MOTION to Expedite or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Motion to Compel Apple to Produce Source Code filed by Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Estremera, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/25/2022) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

1 #8

Exhibit 6

1 #7

Exhibit 5

1 #6

Exhibit 4

1 #5

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Proposed Order

1 #1

Declaration of T. Mauze

1 #1

Main Document

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER Granting Motion to Compel Production of Source Code. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 2/11/2022. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2022) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi: Motion #1 to Compel Hearing held on 2/8/2022 via Zoom Webinar remotely.Court heard oral argument and order to issue. Defendant Attorney: Samsung: Christine Lehman, Taylor Mauze, Jennifer Estremera Apple: Bethany Stevens, Hannah Cannon. Total Time in Court:10:00-10:19am(19 Mins). Court Reporter: Zoom Recording. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/8/2022) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion #1 to Compel Hearing is set for 2/8/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vkd Court Appearances: Advanced notice is requi red of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails specifying the main speaker(s) must be sent to the CRD at VKDcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 2/3/2022 at 4:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2022) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #11 Motion to Expedite Hearing on Motion to Compel #1 and Denying Motion to Transfer. Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2022) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #11 MOTION to Expedite or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Motion to Compel Apple to Produce Source Code ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bethany Stevens, #2 Exhibit A to Stevens Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Stevens, Bethany) (Filed on 1/31/2022) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Appendix re #11 MOTION to Expedite or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Motion to Compel Apple to Produce Source Code filed bySamsung Electronics Co, Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #11 ) (Estremera, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/28/2022) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. ("Samsung") have filed #11 a motion to expedite or, in the alternative, to transfer #1 the motion to compel Apple Inc. ("Apple") to produce source code. The Court construes Samsung's motion to expedite as a motion for administrative relief. Civ. L.R. 7-11. Accordingly, Apple must file its opposition, if any, by January 31, 2022. Civ. L.R. 7-11(b). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2022) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Expedite or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Motion to Compel Apple to Produce Source Code filed by Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Estremera, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/25/2022) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Reply in Support re #1 Motion to Compel (Miscellaneous Case Opening), Reply ISO Samsung's Motion to Compel filed bySamsung Electronics Co, Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of T. Mauze, #2 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Estremera, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/25/2022) Modified on 1/26/2022 (ark, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING.Motion to Compel #1 Hearing set for 3/8/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vkd General Order 58. Persons granted acces s to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, CO URT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2022) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Response re #1 Motion to Compel (Miscellaneous Case Opening), NON-PARTY APPLE INC.S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF SOURCE CODE byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Garrett Sakimae in Support of Opposition, #2 Declaration of Hannah L. Cannom in Support of Opposition, #3 Exhibit A to Cannom Declaration)(Cannom, Hannah) (Filed on 1/18/2022) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #4 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice (Lehman). (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2022) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #3 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice (Mauze). (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2022) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2022) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Christine E. Lehman ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16771134.) filed by Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Lehman, Christine) (Filed on 1/4/2022) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Taylor N. Mauze ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16771126.) filed by Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Mauze, Taylor) (Filed on 1/4/2022) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Prieb Estremera ON BEHALF OF SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.S AND SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. (Estremera, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/4/2022) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION TO COMPEL Apple to Produce Source Code against SOLAS OLED LTD. ( Filing fee $ 49, receipt number ACANDC-16771095.). Filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of T. Mauze, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6)(Estremera, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/4/2022) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Solas OLED Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hannah Lynn Cannom