This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/03/2021 at 05:06:08 (UTC).

Glinoga v. Robinhood Markets, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On December 1, 2021, Mark Glinoga (“Plaintiff”), individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, represented by Jonathan Shub of Shub Law Firm LLC, filed a personal property fraud lawsuit against Robinhood Markets, Inc; Robinhood Crypto, LLC; Robinhood Financial, LLC; and Robinhood Securities, LLC (collectively, “Defendants” or “Robinhood”), seeking monetary relief including restitution and disgorgement with prejudgment and post-judgment interest, costs, expenses and attorneys’ fees, for the alleged breach of contracts by failing to safeguard Plaintiff’s and the Class Members’ PII. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the Northern District of California with Judge Kandis A. Westmore presiding. 

 

In the complaint, Plaintiff alleged that, “This class action arises out of the recent cyberattack and data breach that was perpetrated against Robinhood (the “Data Breach”). The Data Breach resulted in unauthorized access and exfiltration of sensitive and personal identifiable information (the “PII”) of approximately 7 million Robinhood users, including Plaintiff (the “Class Members”). As a result, affected Class Members are vulnerable to present injury and damages in the form of identity theft, out-of-pocket expenses and the value of time reasonably incurred to remedy or mitigate the effects if the unauthorized access, exfiltration, and subsequent criminal misuse of the Private Information.” 

 

Plaintiff further alleged that, “Plaintiff brings this class action lawsuit on behalf of those similarly situated to address Defendants’ inadequate safeguarding of Class Members’ Private Information that is collected and maintained. The mechanism of cyberattack and potential for improper disclosure of Plaintiff’s and Class Members’ PII was a known risk to Defendants, and thus Defendants were on notice that failing to take steps necessary to secure the PII from the risk of ransomware attack.”

 

Plaintiff also alleged that, “Plaintiff’s and Class Members’ PII are now at considerable risk because of Defendants’ negligent conduct since the PII that Robinhood collected and maintained is now in the hand of data thieves. Plaintiff and Class Members’ PII was compromised due to Defendants’ negligent and/or careless act and omissions and their failure to adequately protect the PII of their current, for, and prospective clients.”

 

Plaintiff lists out seven claims for relief. The first claim is for negligence. The second claim is for the breach of contract. The third claim is for breach of implied contract. The fourth claim is for unjust enrichment. The fifth claim is for declaratory judgment. The sixth claim is for the violation of California Unfair Competition Law, and the seventh claim is for violations of California’s Consumer Privacy Act. 

 

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff requested the court for an order certifying this action as a class action under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23, and a judgment in favor of Plaintiff and the Class Members awarding them appropriate monetary relief, including actual damages, statutory damages, equitable relief, restitution, disgorgement, and statutory costs along with prejudgment and post judgment interest, reasonable attorneys’ fees, costs, and expenses. Plaintiff further requested for an order providing injunctive and other equitable relief as necessary to protect the interests of the classes as requested herein and an award of such other and further relief as the court may deem just and proper. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-09290

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kandis A. Westmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Glinoga

Defendants

Robinhood Markets, Inc.

Robinhood Crypto, LLC

Robinhood Financial LLC

Robinhood Securities, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan Shub

Attorney at Shub Law Firm LLC

134 Kings Highway East, Second Floor

Haddonfield, NJ 08033

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #5

Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/15/2021. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2021) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisregard clerks error#Electronic filing error. Civil Cover Sheet missing. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Mark Glinoga (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2021) Modified on 12/1/2021 (as, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ACANDC-16677305 against All Defendants. Filed byMark Glinoga. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/1/2021) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Robinhood Securities, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Robinhood Markets, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Robinhood Financial LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONATHAN SHUB