This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:24:36 (UTC).

Standard Insurance Company v. Pittman et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Standard Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Pittman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald B. Leighton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-06174

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald B. Leighton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Interpleader

Standard Insurance Company

Defendants

Myuah Pittman

Portland, OR 97230

T. P.

Portland, OR 97233

Pareece Pittman

Portland, OR 97233

Emmeriah McDowell

Houston, TX 77088

Tranissa Pittman

Portland, OR 97233

Tim Pittman

Portland, OR 97217

Markette Norris

Portland, OR 97230

Barbara Pittman

Vancouver, WA 98683

Nina Lambert

Portland, OR 97230

T.P.

Markitta Norris

M.N.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Interpleader Attorney

Steven Douglas Jensen

Attorney at JENSEN MORSE BAKER

1809 Seventh Avenue, Ste 410

Seattle, WA 98101

 

Court Documents

12 #2

Summons

12 #1

Summons

#12

(#12) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Nina Lambert, M.N., Markitta Norris (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(GMR) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

10 #3

Summons Amended Summons to N. Lambert

#10

(#10) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint,, #2 Summons Issued, by Plaintiff Standard Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons Amended Summons to M.N., #2 Summons Amended Summons to M. Norris, #3 Summons Amended Summons to N. Lambert)(Jensen, Steven) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MOTION to Seal Certain Court Filings, filed by Plaintiff Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/21/2020, (Jensen, Steven) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

1 #10

Summons

1 #9

Summons

1 #8

Summons

1 #7

Summons

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Nina Lambert, M.N., Markitta Norris (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(GMR) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint,, #2 Summons Issued, by Plaintiff Standard Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons Amended Summons to M.N., #2 Summons Amended Summons to M. Norris, #3 Summons Amended Summons to N. Lambert)(Jensen, Steven) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DECLARATION of Steven D. Jensen filed by Plaintiff Standard Insurance Company re #8 MOTION to Seal Certain Court Filings (Jensen, Steven) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Seal Certain Court Filings, filed by Plaintiff Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/21/2020, (Jensen, Steven) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Meiji Yasuda Life Insurance Company, Corporate Parent StanCorp Financial Group, Inc. for Standard Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Standard Insurance Company (Jensen, Steven) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT in Interpleader against All Defendants, filed by Standard Insurance Company.(Jensen, Steven) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 3/10/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/25/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/3/2020, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SEALED CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no StanCorp Financial Group Inc and Meiji Yasuda Life Insurance Company as Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Standard Insurance Company (Jensen, Steven) Modified on 12/11/2019 (GMR). Modified on 1/23/2020 (MET). (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketNOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Standard Insurance Company must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 12/17/2019. (GMR) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Nina Lambert, Emmeriah McDowell, Markette Norris, T.P., Barbara Pittman, Myuah Pittman, Pareece Pittman, Tim Pittman, Tranissa Pittman (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(GMR) Modified on 1/23/2020 (DN). (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketJudge Ronald B. Leighton added. (GMR) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SEALED COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER against defendant(s) Barbara Pittman, Tim Pittman, T. P. Pareece Pittman, Tranissa Pittman, Myuah Pittman, Emmeriah McDowell, Markette Norris and Nina Lambert Standard Insurance Company (Receipt # 0981-6039654), filed by Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Jensen, Steven) Modified on 12/10/2019 (GMR). Modified on 1/23/2020 (DN). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less