This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/07/2021 at 09:38:40 (UTC).

Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore v. Glaxosmithkline LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2021 Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Glaxosmithkline LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is George Levi Russell, III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00041

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George Levi Russell, III

 

Party Details

Defendants

Giant of Maryland, LLC

Chattem, Inc.

Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC

Rite Aid Corporation

Appco Pharma LLC

Novitium Pharma LLC

Glaxosmithkline LLC

Albertsons Companies

Sanofi US Services Inc.

Pfizer, Inc.

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC

Shoprite of Perring Parkway, LLC

Ani Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Wakefern Food Corp.

Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc.

Harris Teeter, LLC

Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA

Safeway Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Lannet Company, Inc.

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Perie Reiko Koyama

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

2200 Pennsylvania Ave. Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Sean Hennessy

Attorney at Arnold & Porter

601 Massachusetts Ave. Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Christopher Kip Schwartz

Attorney at ULMER & BERNE LLP

1054 31St Street Nw, Suite 280

Washington, DC 20007

Ryan Michael Duffy

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

1500 K Street, Nw, Suite 330

Washington, DC 20005

Dennis J Lawson

Attorney at Dechert LLP

1900 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Jonathan Adler Direnfeld

Attorney at Orrick Herrington and Sutcliffe LLP

1152 15Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Taylor T Lankford

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1700 Pennsylvania Ave., Nw, Ste. 200

Washington, DC 20006

Douglas P Hibshman

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

1030 15Th St Nw Ste 380 East

Washington, DC 20005

Other Attorneys

William H White, Jr

Attorney at Kiernan Trebach LLP

1233 20Th St Nw Ste 800

Washington, DC 20036

Kamil Ismail

Attorney at Goodell DeVries Leech and Dann LLP

One South St 20Th Fl

Baltimore, MD 21202

Kyle J McGee

Attorney at Grant and Eisenhofer PA

123 Justison St. 7Th Fl.

Wilmington, DE 19801

Ann Marie Duffy

Attorney at Hollingsworth LLP

1350 I St. Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Namrata Loomba

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

1825 Eye Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

Martin Eugene Wolf

Attorney at Gordon, Wolf & Carney, Chtd

100 W Pennsylvania Ave Ste 100

Towson, MD 21204

Laina M Herber

Attorney at Grant and Eisenhofer PA

123 S. Justison St.

Wilimington, DE 19801

Anna G Kornilova

Attorney at Hollingsworth LLP

1350 I St. Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Keith Michael Lusby

Attorney at Gebhardt & Smith, LLP

One South Street, Suite 2200

Baltimore, MD 21202

Dana Petersen Moore

Attorney at Office of the City Solicitor

100 N Holliday St. Ste. 101

Baltimore, MD 21202

 

Court Documents

76 #1

Cover Letter

#76

#75

#74

#52

#51

9 #2

Exhibit

9 #1

Memorandum in Support

#9

#5

#4

3 #1

Case Information Report

#3

1 #4

Exhibit State Court Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit State Court Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit Slip Op

1 #1

Exhibit Transfer Order

#1

118 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCase electronically transferred to the USDC for the Southern Division of Florida. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketSTAY LIFTED. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) MDL Certified Order Lifting Stay of Conditional Transfer. Signed by Clerk of the MDL Panel on 2/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) ORDER denying without prejudice #6 City's Motion to Remand; granting #9 Defendants' Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation; and directing the case is STAYED. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 2/1/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Teligent, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Teligent, Inc., Other Affiliate CNA Insurance for Teligent, Inc..(White, William) (Entered: 01/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #52 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Laina M Herbert. Directing attorney Laina M Herbert to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 1/29/2021. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #51 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kyle J McGee. Directing attorney Kyle J McGee to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 1/29/2021. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Affidavit, #6 Affidavit, #7 Affidavit, #8 Affidavit, #9 Affidavit, #10 Affidavit, #11 Affidavit, #12 Affidavit, #13 Affidavit, #14 Affidavit, #15 Affidavit, #16 Affidavit, #17 Affidavit, #18 Affidavit, #19 Affidavit, #20 Affidavit, #21 Affidavit, #22 Affidavit, #23 Affidavit, #24 Affidavit, #25 Affidavit, #26 Affidavit, #27 Affidavit, #28 Affidavit, #29 Affidavit, #30 Affidavit, #31 Affidavit, #32 Affidavit)(Wolf, Martin) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) QC NOTICE: #53 #54 #55 #56 #57 #58 #59 #60 #61 #62 #63 #64 #65 #66 #67 #68 #69 Affidavit of Service filed by Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event was selected. Please refile using the event under Service of Process: Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 1/26/2021 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons/Complaint served on Sandoz Inc. on 12/4/2020, filed by Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore.(Wolf, Martin) Modified on 1/26/2021 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Perrigo Research & Development Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ismail, Kamil) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Certificate of Service, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Wolf, Martin) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Perrigo Research and Development Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet (Ismail, Kamil) Modified on 1/11/2021 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 1/8/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketDeficiency Notice to Perrigo Research and Development Company. Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 1/15/2021 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Civil Cover Sheet. To correct this problem, file Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) and link Civil Cover Sheet to #1 Notice of Removal. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketTHE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT OF MARYLAND FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Albertsons Companies, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Ani Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Apotex Corp., Appco Pharma LLC, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc., Giant of Maryland, LLC, Glaxosmithkline LLC, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA, Harris Teeter, LLC, Lannet Company, Inc., Novitium Pharma LLC, Perrigo Research & Development Company, Pfizer, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Safeway Inc., Sandoz Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Shoprite of Liberty Heights, LLC, Shoprite of Perring Parkway, LLC, Strides Pharma, Inc., Target Corporation, Teligent, Inc., The Kroger Co., Wakefern Food Corp., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreens Co. filed by Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Baltimore City Circuit Court, case number CV-24-CV-20-004788. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9047050), filed by Perrigo Research and Development Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit Slip Op, #3 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit State Court Civil Cover Sheet)(Ismail, Kamil) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Harris Teeter, LLC is a litigant