This case was last updated from PACER on 11/29/2021 at 07:10:49 (UTC).

PARK PLACE KENDALL CONDOMINIUM IV ASSOCIATION, INC. v. ROCKHILL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 PARK PLACE KENDALL CONDOMINIUM IV ASSOCIATION, INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ROCKHILL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Federico A. Moreno. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-23490

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Federico A. Moreno

 

Party Details

Defendants and Plaintiffs

PARK PLACE KENDALL CONDOMINIUM IV ASSOCIATION, INC.,

13030 Sw 133Rd Ct.

Miami, FL 33186

Rockhill Insurance Company

700 West 47Th Street, Suite 350

Kansas City, MO 64112

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Frantz C Nelson

Attorney at Vernis & Bowling of Broward, PA

5821 Hollywood Blvd., 1St Floor

Hollywood, FL 33021

Jose Pete Font

Attorney at Font & Nelson, LLC

200 S. Andrews Ave., Suite 501

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorney

Miguel Gaspar Fernandez

3170 Sw 22Nd St., Apt. 1615

Miami, FL 33145

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Designation DEFENDANTS CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Rockhill Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/26/2021 (Fernandez, Miguel) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#4

(#4) RESPONSE to Motion re #3 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PARK PLACE KENDALL CONDOMINIUM IV ASSOCIATION, INC.,. Replies due by 11/2/2021. (Font, Jose) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RESPONSE to Motion re #3 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PARK PLACE KENDALL CONDOMINIUM IV ASSOCIATION, INC.,. Replies due by 11/2/2021. (Font, Jose) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Rockhill Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/26/2021 (Fernandez, Miguel) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - PARK PLACE OF KENDALL CONDOMINIUM IV ASSOCIATION, INC. v. ROCKHILL INSURANCE COMPANY) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15057449, filed by Rockhill Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Designation DEFENDANTS CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fernandez, Miguel) (No Answer/Motion to Dismiss Filed)Modified text on 10/1/2021 (jbs). (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROCKHILL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant