This case was last updated from PACER on 12/03/2019 at 08:10:51 (UTC).

Pizza Hut, LLC v. Pandya et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2019 Pizza Hut, LLC filed a Contract - Franchise lawsuit against Pandya. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert W. Schroeder, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00726

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Franchise

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert W. Schroeder, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pizza Hut LLC

Defendants

Jignesh N. Pandya

JNP Foods LLC

Pandya Restaurants LLC

Ronak Roods LLC

JNP Foods, LLC

Ronak Pandya

Mozzarella Kitchen Company, LLC

8 New Britain Pizza LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William S Richmond

Attorney at Platt Cheema Richmond PLLC

1201 N. Riverfront Blvd., Suite 150

Dallas, TX 75207

Laura Elizabeth Brandt

Attorney at Platt Cheema Richmond PLLC

1201 N. Riverfront Blvd., Suite 150

Dallas, TX 75207

Defendant Attorneys

Craig A Harris

Attorney at Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, PC - Dallas

500 North Akard Street, 3800 Ross Tower

Dallas, TX 75201-6659

Glenn A. Parno

Attorney at Capozzi Adler, PC

2933 N. Front Street

Harrisburg, PA 17110

Jared Michael Slade

Attorney at Alston and Bird LLP - Dallas

2200 Ross Ave, Suite 2300

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#37

(#37) NOTICE by Mozzarella Kitchen Company, LLC, Ronak Pandya re #34 Order on Motion for TRO,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Discovery,,,,,, #36 Notice (Other) Supplemental Notice re status (Slade, Jared) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#36

(#36) NOTICE by Pizza Hut LLC re #34 Order on Motion for TRO,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Discovery,,,,,, Parties' Notice Pursuant to Order (Brandt, Laura) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#35

(#35) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jared Michael Slade on behalf of Mozzarella Kitchen Company, LLC, Ronak Pandya (Slade, Jared) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#34

(#34) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #13 Motion for TRO and #19 Motion for Discovery. It is hereby ORDERED that the J. Pandya Defendants (Jignesh Pandya; Ronak Foods, LLC; JNP Foods, LLC; Pandya Restaurants, LLC; and 8 New Britain Pizza) and anyone acting in concert with the J. Pandya Defendants SHALL NOT, for a period of 28 days from this Order, engage, or assist others to engage, directly or indirectly, individually or as a partner, joint venturer, shareholder, officer, creditor, director, employee, or agent, in the production or sale (at wholesale or retail) of any pizza, pasta or other food items similar to Approved Products: (a) within a 25-mile radius of any Location; (b) anywhere within the county within which one or more Locations are situated; or (c) anywhere within 10 miles of a location in the United States at which [Pizza Hut] or any subsidiary, Affiliates or franchisee of Pizza Hut operates a System Restaurant on the date of termination or expiration of the Franchise Agreement. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer regarding the scope of limited written and deposition discovery relevant to a preliminary injunction and complete such discovery within 14 days of this Order. It is further ORDERED that Pizza Hut shall file a brief and record evidence in support of its request for a preliminary injunction by 5 p.m. on December 13, 2019. Defendants shall file any response by 5 p.m. on December 18, 2019. The Court SETS a preliminary injunction hearing at 1 p.m. on December 20, 2019 in Texarkana, Texas. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/26/2019. (rpc, ) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

19 #7

Exhibit RFA - R.Pandya

19 #6

Exhibit RFA - Ronak Foods

19 #1

Exhibit A - Expedited RFPs

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#13

(#34) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #13 Motion for TRO and #19 Motion for Discovery. It is hereby ORDERED that the J. Pandya Defendants (Jignesh Pandya; Ronak Foods, LLC; JNP Foods, LLC; Pandya Restaurants, LLC; and 8 New Britain Pizza) and anyone acting in concert with the J. Pandya Defendants SHALL NOT, for a period of 28 days from this Order, engage, or assist others to engage, directly or indirectly, individually or as a partner, joint venturer, shareholder, officer, creditor, director, employee, or agent, in the production or sale (at wholesale or retail) of any pizza, pasta or other food items similar to Approved Products: (a) within a 25-mile radius of any Location; (b) anywhere within the county within which one or more Locations are situated; or (c) anywhere within 10 miles of a location in the United States at which [Pizza Hut] or any subsidiary, Affiliates or franchisee of Pizza Hut operates a System Restaurant on the date of termination or expiration of the Franchise Agreement. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer regarding the scope of limited written and deposition discovery relevant to a preliminary injunction and complete such discovery within 14 days of this Order. It is further ORDERED that Pizza Hut shall file a brief and record evidence in support of its request for a preliminary injunction by 5 p.m. on December 13, 2019. Defendants shall file any response by 5 p.m. on December 18, 2019. The Court SETS a preliminary injunction hearing at 1 p.m. on December 20, 2019 in Texarkana, Texas. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/26/2019. (rpc, ) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pizza Hut LLC. Jignesh N. Pandya waiver sent on 10/14/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Richmond, William) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Pizza Hut LLC Certificate of Interested Parties (Richmond, William) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura Elizabeth Brandt on behalf of Pizza Hut LLC (Brandt, Laura) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to JNP Foods LLC. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Ronak Roods LLC. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Pandya Restaurants LLC. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to Jignesh N. Pandya. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7465615.), filed by Pizza Hut LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richmond, William) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) NOTICE by Mozzarella Kitchen Company, LLC, Ronak Pandya re #34 Order on Motion for TRO,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Discovery,,,,,, #36 Notice (Other) Supplemental Notice re status (Slade, Jared) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) NOTICE by Pizza Hut LLC re #34 Order on Motion for TRO,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Discovery,,,,,, Parties' Notice Pursuant to Order (Brandt, Laura) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jared Michael Slade on behalf of Mozzarella Kitchen Company, LLC, Ronak Pandya (Slade, Jared) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 12/20/2019 at 01:00 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. (rpc, ) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #13 Motion for TRO and #19 Motion for Discovery. It is hereby ORDERED that the J. Pandya Defendants (Jignesh Pandya; Ronak Foods, LLC; JNP Foods, LLC; Pandya Restaurants, LLC; and 8 New Britain Pizza) and anyone acting in concert with the J. Pandya Defendants SHALL NOT, for a period of 28 days from this Order, engage, or assist others to engage, directly or indirectly, individually or as a partner, joint venturer, shareholder, officer, creditor, director, employee, or agent, in the production or sale (at wholesale or retail) of any pizza, pasta or other food items similar to Approved Products: (a) within a 25-mile radius of any Location; (b) anywhere within the county within which one or more Locations are situated; or (c) anywhere within 10 miles of a location in the United States at which [Pizza Hut] or any subsidiary, Affiliates or franchisee of Pizza Hut operates a System Restaurant on the date of termination or expiration of the Franchise Agreement. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer regarding the scope of limited written and deposition discovery relevant to a preliminary injunction and complete such discovery within 14 days of this Order. It is further ORDERED that Pizza Hut shall file a brief and record evidence in support of its request for a preliminary injunction by 5 p.m. on December 13, 2019. Defendants shall file any response by 5 p.m. on December 18, 2019. The Court SETS a preliminary injunction hearing at 1 p.m. on December 20, 2019 in Texarkana, Texas. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/26/2019. (rpc, ) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Plaintiff Amended Complaint; Plaintiff's Application for Temporary and Preliminary Injunctive Relief; and Order Setting Hearing served on Jignesh Pandya on 11/22/2019, filed by Pizza Hut LLC. (Richmond, William) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Plaintiff Amended Complaint; Plaintiff's Application for Temporary and Preliminary Injunctive Relief; and Order Setting Hearing served on 8 New Britain Pizza on 11/22/2019, filed by Pizza Hut LLC. (Richmond, William) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Plaintiff Amended Complaint; Plaintiff's Application for Temporary and Preliminary Injunctive Relief; Amended Appendix of Exhibits; and Order Setting Hearing served on Mozzarella Kitchen Company on 11/22/2019, filed by Pizza Hut LLC. (Richmond, William) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Plaintiff Amended Complaint; Plaintiff's Application for Temporary and Preliminary Injunctive Relief; Amended Appendix of Exhibits; and Order Setting Hearing served on Mozzarella Kitchen Company on 11/22/2019, filed by Pizza Hut LLC. (Richmond, William) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Plaintiff Amended Complaint; Plaintiff's Application for Temporary and Preliminary Injunctive Relief; Amended Appendix of Exhibits; and Order Setting Hearing served on Mozzarella Kitchen Company c/o Ronak Pandya on 11/22/2019, filed by Pizza Hut LLC. (Richmond, William) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pizza Hut LLC. Jignesh N. Pandya waiver sent on 10/14/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Richmond, William) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by Pizza Hut LLC Certificate of Interested Parties (Richmond, William) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura Elizabeth Brandt on behalf of Pizza Hut LLC (Brandt, Laura) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued as to JNP Foods LLC. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Ronak Roods LLC. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Pandya Restaurants LLC. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Issued as to Jignesh N. Pandya. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Case assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7465615.), filed by Pizza Hut LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richmond, William) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.