This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 19:11:28 (UTC).

Worley v. Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 Worley filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brenda Weksler and James C. Mahan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01024

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

Presiding Judge

James C. Mahan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Victoria Worley

Defendants

Jeanette Montgomery

Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric Hinckley

Attorney at Lowe Law Group

6671 Las Vegas Blvd., Suite 210

Las Vegas, NV 89119

Defendant Attorneys

Bruce Alverson

Attorney at Alverson Taylor & Sanders

6605 Grand Montecito Pkwy., Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89149

Karie N. Wilson

Attorney at Alverson Taylor & Sanders

6605 Grand Montecito Parkway #200

Las Vegas, NV 89149

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#11

#12

#13

#14

#15

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 7/23/2021 #9 Motion.Presently before the court is a stipulated motion (ECF No. #9 ) to extend the time for plaintiff Victoria Worley to respond to defendant Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.'s motion to change venue. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPLY to Response to #8 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Victoria Worley. (Hinckley, Eric) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPLY to Response to #5 Motion to Change Venue by Defendant Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. Replies due by 7/13/2021. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE to #5 Motion to Change Venue by Plaintiff Victoria Worley. Replies due by 7/8/2021. (Hinckley, Eric) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Victoria Worley. (Hinckley, Eric) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Docket Correction to #9 filed by attorney Eric Hinckley. The Court has corrected and changed the event from Motion to Stipulation. No further action is required. Do not refile document. (no image attached) (SLD) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Respond re #5 Motion to Change Venue, by Plaintiff Victoria Worley. (Hinckley, Eric) Modified event on 6/24/2021 (SLD). (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Victoria Worley. Responses due by 7/7/2021. (Hinckley, Eric) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Eric Hinckley on behalf of Plaintiff Victoria Worley. (Hinckley, Eric) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #4 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Change Venue, filed by Defendant Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. Responses due by 6/24/2021. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 5/28/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/12/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/27/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (DRS) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Case Number A-21-834719-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6504526) by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. Proof of service due by 8/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wilson, Karie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric Hinckley