This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/19/2020 at 11:47:39 (UTC).

Myan Management Group LLC v. GuideOne National Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/20/2020 Myan Management Group LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against GuideOne National Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is David Counts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-00126

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Counts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Claimant

Myan Management Group LLC

Defendant

GuideOne National Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Claimant Attorneys

Jeffrey T. Embry

Attorney at Hossley & Embry LLP

515 S. Vine Ave.

Tyler, TX 75702

Christopher Patrick Peirce

Attorney at Hossley Embry LLP

515 S. Vine Ave.

Tyler, TX 75702

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to GuideOne National Insurance Company. (se) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

#7

(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Myan Management Group LLC. (Embry, Jeffrey) (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/15/2020 with flattened form) (se). (Entered: 06/14/2020)

#6

(#6) Letter/Correspondence to the Court. (se) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey T. Embry of Applicant Christopher Peirce ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13599415) by on behalf of Myan Management Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Embry, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/23/2020)

#4

(#4) Pro Hac Vice Letter. (slt) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to GuideOne National Insurance Company. (slt) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Myan Management Group LLC. (Embry, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13588216), filed by Myan Management Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Embry, Jeffrey) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/20/2020) (slt). Modified replaced civil cover sheet with flattened pdf on 5/20/2020 (slt). (Entered: 05/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to GuideOne National Insurance Company. (se) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Myan Management Group LLC. (Embry, Jeffrey) (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/15/2020 with flattened form) (se). (Entered: 06/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter/Correspondence to the Court. (se) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #5 Christopher Patrick Peirce's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. It is further ORDERED that if Mr. Peirce has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey T. Embry of Applicant Christopher Peirce ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13599415) by on behalf of Myan Management Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Embry, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Pro Hac Vice Letter. (slt) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to GuideOne National Insurance Company. (slt) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (slt) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Myan Management Group LLC. (Embry, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13588216), filed by Myan Management Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Embry, Jeffrey) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/20/2020) (slt). Modified replaced civil cover sheet with flattened pdf on 5/20/2020 (slt). (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where MYAN MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey Todd Embry