This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/20/2021 at 10:02:09 (UTC).

Moussa v. HIAS, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 Moussa filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against HIAS, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul W. Grimm. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00160

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul W. Grimm

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ayaan Moussa

Defendant

HIAS, Inc. doing business as Hebrew Immigrant Aid Society

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Broderick Coleman Dunn

Philip C Krone

Alexander Francuzenko

Defendant Attorneys

Peter J Petesch

Meredith Lynn Schramm-Strosser

 

Court Documents

20 #2

Exhibit B

20 #1

Exhibit A

#20

19 #2

Exhibit Amended Complaint Annotated

19 #1

Exhibit Amended Complaint

#19

#16

#15

#14

1 #11

SC - Notice of Filing

1 #9

SC - Order

1 #7

SC - Order

1 #6

SC - Notice

1 #5

SC - Admin Notice

1 #4

SC - Cover Sheet

1 #3

SC - Complaint

1 #2

Notice to Plaintiff

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE re #19 Miscellaneous Correspondence re Motion to Amend Complaint filed by HIAS, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Petesch, Peter) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Correspondence re: Planned Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint Annotated)(Dunn, Broderick) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Philip C Krone. Directing attorney Philip C Krone to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/24/2021. (srds, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • Docket(#17) PAPERLESS ORDER memorializing R16 telephone conference between the Court and the parties. The Court agreed to refer the case to a Magistrate Judge for settlement discussions. Accordingly, the discovery deadlines are stayed for 90 days and the parties are directed to submit a joint statute report by 5/24/21 updating the Court on the status of settlement discussions. If the parties are unable to reach a settlement, they are to submit a joint amended scheduling order containing the original deadlines set out in ECF No. 11 and, in an adjacent column, the proposed deadlines. Additionally, by 3/5/21, Plaintiffs may file a 3-page single-spaced letter setting forth the grounds for amending the complaint, along with a copy of the proposed amended complaint that complies with Local Rule 103.6(c); Defendants may file a 3-page single-spaced letter in opposition by 3/19/21 and Plaintiffs a 3-page single-spaced reply by 3/29/21. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/23/2021. (jc6s, Chambers) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Philip C. Krone (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9123757.) by Ayaan Moussa(Dunn, Broderick) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Francuzenko on behalf of Ayaan Moussa (Francuzenko, Alexander) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Correspondence re: Plaintiff's Disclosure of Damage Claims (Dunn, Broderick) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) LETTER ORDER scheduling a telephone conference call on February 23, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/3/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Initial Discovery Protocols)(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 7/19/2021.. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/3/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by HIAS, Inc. (Petesch, Peter) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant's ANSWER to #3 Complaint by HIAS, Inc..(Petesch, Peter) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer HIAS, Inc. answer due 2/2/2021.. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/22/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by HIAS, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schramm-Strosser, Meredith) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/22/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/21/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketTHE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR MONTGOMERY COUNTY. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) State Court COMPLAINT against HIAS, Inc., filed by Ayaan Moussa.(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Lynn Schramm-Strosser on behalf of HIAS, Inc. (Schramm-Strosser, Meredith) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County Circuit Court, case number 484046-V. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9068254), filed by HIAS, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice to Plaintiff, #3 SC - Complaint, #4 SC - Cover Sheet, #5 SC - Admin Notice, #6 SC - Notice, #7 SC - Order, #8 SC - Notice, #9 SC - Order, #10 SC - Summons, #11 SC - Notice of Filing)(Petesch, Peter) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less