This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 07:11:10 (UTC).

United States of America v. Mortgage Solutions FCS, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 United States of America filed an Other lawsuit against Mortgage Solutions FCS, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donna M. Ryu. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00110

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donna M. Ryu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS FCS, INC

Ramon Walker

Mortgage Solutions FCS, Inc a corporation doing business as Mount Diablo Lending

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Speare Hodges

Attorney at Department of Justice

450 5Th Street, N.W. Suite 6400-South

Washington, DC 20001

David Westley Lincicum

Attorney at Federal Trade Commission

600 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20580

Defendant Attorneys

Liana W Chen

Attorney at Kronenberger Rosenfeld

Suite 520, 150 Post Street, San Francisco

San Francisco, CA 94133

Karl Stephen Kronenberger

Attorney at Kronenberger Rosenfeld, LLP

150 Post Street, Suite 520

San Francisco, CA 94108

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION,CIVIL PENALTIES, AND OTHERRELIEF by Judge Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: This Court retains jurisdiction of this matter for purposes of construction, modification, and enforcement of this Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2020) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#11

(#11) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Hodges, Speare) (Filed on 1/9/2020) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Liana W Chen (Chen, Liana) (Filed on 1/9/2020) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#9

(#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by Mortgage Solutions FCS, Inc, Ramon Walker identifying Other Affiliate The W Realty Group. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 1/9/2020) Modified on 1/9/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/9/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mortgage Solutions FCS, Inc, Ramon Walker.. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 1/9/2020) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Karl Stephen Kronenberger (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 1/9/2020) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#5

(#5) [Proposed] Stipulated Order for Permanent Injunction, Civil Penalties, and other Relief filed by United States of America, Mortgage Solutions FCS, Inc., Ramon Walker. (Hodges, Speare) (Filed on 1/8/2020) Modified on 1/8/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#4

(#4) [PROPOSED] STIPULATED ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION, CIVIL PENALTIES, AND OTHER RELIEF by United States of America, Mortgage Solutions FCS, Inc., Ramon Walker. (Hodges, Speare) (Filed on 1/7/2020) Modified on 1/7/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#3

(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (fee waived) (no process) against All Defendants. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hodges, Speare) (Filed on 1/6/2020) Modified on 1/7/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION,CIVIL PENALTIES, AND OTHERRELIEF by Judge Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: This Court retains jurisdiction of this matter for purposes of construction, modification, and enforcement of this Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2020) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Hodges, Speare) (Filed on 1/9/2020) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Liana W Chen (Chen, Liana) (Filed on 1/9/2020) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by Mortgage Solutions FCS, Inc, Ramon Walker identifying Other Affiliate The W Realty Group. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 1/9/2020) Modified on 1/9/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/9/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mortgage Solutions FCS, Inc, Ramon Walker.. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 1/9/2020) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Karl Stephen Kronenberger (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 1/9/2020) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: The parties have asked the court to enter a Stipulated Order for Permanent Injunction, Civil Penalties, and other Relief filed by Ramon Walker, Mortgage Solutions FCS, Inc, and the United States of America #5 , which includes a request that the court retain jurisdiction of this matter for construction, modification, and enforcement. The parties have asked that they be permitted to file a joint consent motion signed by all parties consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) without Defendants making an appearance. The parties shall research whether the court may retain jurisdiction over the matter even if Defendants have not appeared, and include authority on this issue in any such joint consent motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/9/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2020) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) [Proposed] Stipulated Order for Permanent Injunction, Civil Penalties, and other Relief filed by United States of America, Mortgage Solutions FCS, Inc., Ramon Walker. (Hodges, Speare) (Filed on 1/8/2020) Modified on 1/8/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The Proper Event is a Stipulation and Proposed Order. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re- file in its entirety Re: #4 Proposed Order filed by Ramon Walker, Mortgage Solutions FCS, Inc, United States of America. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2020) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) [PROPOSED] STIPULATED ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION, CIVIL PENALTIES, AND OTHER RELIEF by United States of America, Mortgage Solutions FCS, Inc., Ramon Walker. (Hodges, Speare) (Filed on 1/7/2020) Modified on 1/7/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/21/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (fee waived) (no process) against All Defendants. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hodges, Speare) (Filed on 1/6/2020) Modified on 1/7/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less