This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/24/2020 at 09:19:15 (UTC).

MONOLITHIC POWER SYSTEMS, INC., et al v. MERAKI INTEGRATED CIRCUIT (SHENZHEN) TECHNOLOGY, LTD., et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 MONOLITHIC POWER SYSTEMS, INC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against MERAKI INTEGRATED CIRCUIT SHENZHEN TECHNOLOGY, LTD . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00876

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.

Chengdu Monolithic Power Systems Co., Ltd.

Defendants

MERAKI INTEGRATED CIRCUIT (SHENZHEN) TECHNOLOGY, LTD., a Chinese corporation

CHENGDU MONOLITHIC POWER SYSTEMS CO., LTD., a Chinese Corporation

PROMATE ELECTRONIC CO., LTD., a Taiwanese corporation

MONOLITHIC POWER SYSTEMS, INC., a Delaware corporation

MERAKI INTEGRATED CIRCUIT (SHENZHEN) TECHNOLOGY, LTD.

PROMATE ELECTRONIC CO., LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Janice L. Ta

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

500 W 2Nd St 1900

Austin, TX 78701

John D. Esterhay

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

11452 El Camino Real, Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130

John P. Schnurer

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

11452 El Camino Real, Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130

Lloyd A. Lim

Attorney at Balch & Bingham LLP

811 Louisiana Street, Suite 1010

Houston, TX 77002

Rachel I. Thompson

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

811 Main Street, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002

Joseph A Bruce

Attorney at Bruce Stone LLP

8888 Keystone Crossing, Ste. 1300

Indianapolis, IN 46240

 

Court Documents

#19

18 #1

Proposed Order

#18

#17

#16

#15

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

6 #12

Exhibit L to Complaint

6 #11

Exhibit K to Complaint

6 #10

Exhibit J to Complaint

6 #9

Exhibit I to Complaint

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: PROMATE ELECTRONIC CO., LTD. answer due 12/10/2020. (am) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by PROMATE ELECTRONIC CO., LTD.. (Bruce, Joseph) (Entered: 11/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph A Bruce for PROMATE ELECTRONIC CO., LTD. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lloyd A. Lim for Joseph A. Bruce ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14163508) by on behalf of PROMATE ELECTRONIC CO., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lim, Lloyd) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lloyd A. Lim on behalf of PROMATE ELECTRONIC CO., LTD. (Lim, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John P. Schnurer on behalf of Chengdu Monolithic Power Systems Co., Ltd., Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. Attorney John P. Schnurer added to party Chengdu Monolithic Power Systems Co., Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney John P. Schnurer added to party Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.(pty:pla) (Schnurer, John) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John D. Esterhay on behalf of Chengdu Monolithic Power Systems Co., Ltd., Monolithic Power Systems, Inc. (Esterhay, John) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by PROMATE ELECTRONIC CO., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lim, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketWaiver of Service of Summons: MERAKI INTEGRATED CIRCUIT (SHENZHEN) TECHNOLOGY, LTD. answer due 12/28/2020. (bw) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docs received in Clerk's Office for service to Promate Electronic Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Pickup receipt) (lad) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to PROMATE ELECTRONIC CO., LTD.. (am) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to MERAKI INTEGRATED CIRCUIT (SHENZHEN) TECHNOLOGY, LTD.. (am) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTACHMENT Attaching Exhibits to Complaint to #1 Complaint, by Chengdu Monolithic Power Systems Co., Ltd., Monolithic Power Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Exhibit D to Complaint, #5 Exhibit E to Complaint, #6 Exhibit F to Complaint, #7 Exhibit G to Complaint, #8 Exhibit H to Complaint, #9 Exhibit I to Complaint, #10 Exhibit J to Complaint, #11 Exhibit K to Complaint, #12 Exhibit L to Complaint)(Ta, Janice) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Janice L. Ta on behalf of CHENGDU MONOLITHIC POWER SYSTEMS CO., LTD., a Chinese Corporation, MONOLITHIC POWER SYSTEMS, INC., a Delaware corporation (Ta, Janice) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by CHENGDU MONOLITHIC POWER SYSTEMS CO., LTD., a Chinese Corporation, MONOLITHIC POWER SYSTEMS, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Ta, Janice) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CHENGDU MONOLITHIC POWER SYSTEMS CO., LTD., a Chinese Corporation, MONOLITHIC POWER SYSTEMS, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Ta, Janice) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ta, Janice) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement, Trade Secret Misappropriation, Tortious Interference, and Unfair Competition ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14009299), filed by MONOLITHIC POWER SYSTEMS, INC., a Delaware corporation, CHENGDU MONOLITHIC POWER SYSTEMS CO., LTD., a Chinese Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ta, Janice) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Monolithic Power Systems, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Janice Ta

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John D. Esterhay