This case was last updated from PACER on 01/18/2021 at 10:23:04 (UTC).

Jack Henry & Associates, Inc. v. Milestone IP LLC

Case Summary

On 11/19/2020 Jack Henry Associates, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Milestone IP LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01068

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jack Henry & Associates, Inc.

Defendant

Milestone IP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason Wietjes

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

2950 N. Harwood St., Suite 2100

Dallas, TX 75201

Jay E. Heidrick

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

900 W. 48Th Place, Suite 900

Kansas City, MO 64112

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jay E. Heidrick on behalf of Jack Henry & Associates, Inc. . Attorney Jay E. Heidrick added to party Jack Henry & Associates, Inc. (pty:pla) (Heidrick, Jay) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jack Henry & Associates, Inc. as to Milestone IP LLC. Waiver sent on 11/30/2020, answer due 1/29/2021. (Wietjes, Jason) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Milestone IP LLC. (lad) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jack Henry & Associates, Inc.. (Wietjes, Jason) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/20/2020) (lad). (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Parties by Jack Henry & Associates, Inc.. (Wietjes, Jason) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Patent Noninfringement and Invalidity ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14203812), filed by Jack Henry & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wietjes, Jason) (Attachment 4 replaced on 11/20/2020) (lad). (Entered: 11/19/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jay E. Heidrick on behalf of Jack Henry & Associates, Inc. . Attorney Jay E. Heidrick added to party Jack Henry & Associates, Inc. (pty:pla) (Heidrick, Jay) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jack Henry & Associates, Inc. as to Milestone IP LLC. Waiver sent on 11/30/2020, answer due 1/29/2021. (Wietjes, Jason) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Milestone IP LLC. (lad) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jack Henry & Associates, Inc.. (Wietjes, Jason) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/20/2020) (lad). (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Parties by Jack Henry & Associates, Inc.. (Wietjes, Jason) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Patent Noninfringement and Invalidity ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14203812), filed by Jack Henry & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wietjes, Jason) (Attachment 4 replaced on 11/20/2020) (lad). (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jack Henry & Associates, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Milestone IP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Wietjes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jay E. Heidrick