This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/28/2022 at 09:45:07 (UTC).

Heffner v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 Heffner filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Meta Platforms, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sallie Kim and James Donato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-03849

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Sallie Kim

James Donato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ashleigh Heffner

Defendants

Snap, Inc.

Meta Platforms, Inc.

Facebook, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

Laura R. Garrett

Attorney at Social Media Victims Law Center

1390 Market St, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 98104

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 6/29/2022) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/26/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2022 01:30 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2022) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Meta Platforms, Inc., Snap, Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2022) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#6

(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/29/2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2022. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2022) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ashleigh Heffner.. (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 7/18/2022) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#10

(#10) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 25, 2022. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2022) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

11 #11

Main Document

11 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#12

(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 9/29/2022. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/26/2022. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2022) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Motion for Transfer of Actions to the to the Northern District of Illinois or the Western District of Missouri Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings. These documents are submitted to this court pursuant to JPML Rule 6.2 for informational purposes. The JPML will review the Motion for Transfer to determine whether to consolidate or coordinate the case. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2022) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Motion for Transfer of Actions to the to the Northern District of Illinois or the Western District of Missouri Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings. These documents are submitted to this court pursuant to JPML Rule 6.2 for informational purposes. The JPML will review the Motion for Transfer to determine whether to consolidate or coordinate the case. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2022) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • Docket(#13) ORDER. In light of the JPML proceedings, MDL No. 3047, the case is stayed pending further order. The case management conference set for October 6, 2022, is vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/2/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2022) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 9/29/2022. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/26/2022. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2022) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Judge Maxine M. Chesney no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 7/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2022) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 25, 2022. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2022) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 07/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2022) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2022) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ashleigh Heffner.. (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 7/18/2022) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/29/2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2022. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2022) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. The name for Ashleigh Heffner, Individually and as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Liam Birchfield has been corrected to Ashleigh Heffner and the party type is plaintiff, not defendant. The additional text should not be entered as part of the name. The County Code in the case opening screen has also been corrected to 'US, Outside State' and NOT San Francisco as it refers to plaintiff's county of residence. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Ashleigh Heffner. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2022) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Meta Platforms, Inc., Snap, Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2022) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/26/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2022 01:30 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2022) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/13/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2022) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 6/29/2022) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ashleigh Heffner, Individually and as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Liam Birchfield, ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17307344.). Filed byAshleigh Heffner, Individually and as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Liam Birchfield,. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 6/29/2022) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SNAP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Facebook is a litigant