This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/26/2022 at 07:43:00 (UTC).

MELE v. THE HARTFORD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/25/2022 MELE filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against THE HARTFORD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Christine P. O'Hearn and Sharon A. King. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01017

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christine P. O'Hearn

Referral Judge

Sharon A. King

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREGORY MELE

Defendant

THE HARTFORD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARIA BERMUDEZ

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF MARIA E. BERMUDEZ, LLC

744 South St. #768

Philadelphia, PA 19147

Defendant Attorney

STEPHANIE L. JONAITIS

Attorney at TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP

301 Carnegie Center, Suite 400

Princeton, NJ 08543

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to THE HARTFORD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mag) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHANIE L. JONAITIS on behalf of THE HARTFORD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (JONAITIS, STEPHANIE) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THE HARTFORD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. THE HARTFORD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 3/3/2022, answer due 5/2/2022. (JONAITIS, STEPHANIE) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE HARTFORD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (JONAITIS, STEPHANIE) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE HARTFORD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (JONAITIS, STEPHANIE) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THE HARTFORD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. THE HARTFORD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 3/3/2022, answer due 5/2/2022. (JONAITIS, STEPHANIE) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHANIE L. JONAITIS on behalf of THE HARTFORD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (JONAITIS, STEPHANIE) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to THE HARTFORD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mag) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (mag) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketJudge Christine P. O'Hearn and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (dmw ) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against HARTFORD LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13213152), filed by GREGORY MELE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BERMUDEZ, MARIA) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hartford Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEPHANIE L. JONAITIS