Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/29/2019 at 08:45:42 (UTC).

McConico v Wal-Mart Stores Inc

Case Summary

On 09/30/2019 McConico filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gray M Borden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:19-CV-01600

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gray M Borden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James McConico, Jr

Brent, AL 35034

Defendant

Wal-Mart Stores Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Wesley B Gilchrist

Attorney at LIGHTFOOT FRANKLIN & WHITE LLC

400 20Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Robert Jackson Sewell

Attorney at LIGHTFOOT FRANKLIN & WHITE LLC

400 20Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Change of Address by James McConico, Jr (MRR, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#13

(#13) MOTION to Stay Discovery by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Sewell, Robert) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

12 #2

Exhibit B

12 #1

Exhibit A

#12

(#12) REPLY in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sewell, Robert) Modified text on 10/29/2019 (MRR, ). (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Stay All Motions Filed By the Defendants Until Service is Made Upon Defendant and Green Dot Bank by James McConico, Jr. (MRR, ) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

10 #1

Exhibit

#10

(#10) MOTION to Amend Complaint by James McConico, Jr. (MRR, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2019: #1 Exhibit) (MRR, ). (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#8

(#8) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by James McConico, Jr, Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (MRR, ) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#7

(#7) RESPONSE to Doc #1 Notice of Removal filed by James McConico, Jr. (MRR, ) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than November 21, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after November 21, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on November 13, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-636-3807 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 3676046. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 10/8/19. (MRR, ) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

4 #3

Exhibit C

4 #2

Exhibit B

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#4) MOTION to Dismiss by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sewell, Robert) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores Inc from Circuit Court of Bibb County, case number 07-cv-2019-000009., filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MRR, ) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Change of Address by James McConico, Jr (MRR, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to Stay Discovery by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Sewell, Robert) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPLY in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sewell, Robert) Modified text on 10/29/2019 (MRR, ). (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Stay All Motions Filed By the Defendants Until Service is Made Upon Defendant and Green Dot Bank by James McConico, Jr. (MRR, ) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Amend Complaint by James McConico, Jr. (MRR, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2019: #1 Exhibit) (MRR, ). (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • (#9) TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference scheduled for Wednesday, 11/13/2019 at 10:00 AM is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 10/10/2019. (KMAW) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by James McConico, Jr, Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (MRR, ) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RESPONSE to Doc #1 Notice of Removal filed by James McConico, Jr. (MRR, ) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than November 21, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after November 21, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on November 13, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-636-3807 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 3676046. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 10/8/19. (MRR, ) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) TEXT ORDER: Pending before the court is the #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion on or before 10/22/2019. Defendant may file a reply on or before 10/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 10/08/2019. (KMAW) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Dismiss by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sewell, Robert) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, ) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3445166 (B4601100891). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores Inc from Circuit Court of Bibb County, case number 07-cv-2019-000009., filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(MRR, ). (Sewell, Robert) Modified on 9/30/2019 (MRR, ). (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Wal-Mart Stores Inc (MRR, ) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores Inc from Circuit Court of Bibb County, case number 07-cv-2019-000009., filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MRR, ) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Jackson Sewell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wesley B Gilchrist