This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/22/2019 at 05:11:00 (UTC).

Majestic Oil, Inc. v. Underwriters at Lloyd's, London et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 Majestic Oil, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lynn N Hughes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03149

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lynn N Hughes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Defendant

MAJESTIC OIL, INC.

Defendants

Beazley USA Services, Inc.

Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 623

MAJESTIC OIL, INC.

Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 2623

Underwriters at Lloyd's, London

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Ethan Graham Gibson

Attorney at Fulkerson Lotz LLP

4511 Yoakum Blvd, Ste 200

Houston, TX 77006-5821

Nicholas Michael Brown

Attorney at Fulkerson Lotz LLP

4511 Yoakum Blvd, Ste 200

Houston, TX 77006

Jay W Brown

Attorney at Shackelford Bowen McKinley & Norton, LLP

717 Texas Avenue

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, filed.(Brown, Jay) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#15

(#15) AMENDED ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, filed. (Brown, Jay) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., with Jury Demand by Beazley USA Services, Inc., Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, filed.(Brown, Jay) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#13

(#13) Partial Dismissal #12 . Beazley USA Services, Inc., Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 2623 and Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 623 are dismissed without prejudice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(gclair, 4) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

12 #1

Exhibit A

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Dismissal as to Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 2623, Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 623, Beazley USA Services, Inc. by Majestic Oil, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brown, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#11

(#11) Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Majestic Oil, Inc. filed by Majestic Oil, Inc..(Brown, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Majestic Oil, Inc., filed.(Brown, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 2623, Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 623, Beazley USA Services, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(LoriPurifoy, 4) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#7

(#7) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 623, filed.(Gibson, Ethan) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#6

(#6) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 2623, filed.(Gibson, Ethan) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#5

(#5) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Beazley USA Services, Inc., filed.(Gibson, Ethan) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

3 #2

Exhibit 2

3 #1

Exhibit 1

#3

(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Beazley USA Services, Inc., Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 2623, Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 623 filed by MAJESTIC OIL, INC.. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by MAJESTIC OIL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gibson, Ethan) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, filed.(Brown, Jay) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) AMENDED ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, filed. (Brown, Jay) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., with Jury Demand by Beazley USA Services, Inc., Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, filed.(Brown, Jay) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Partial Dismissal #12 . Beazley USA Services, Inc., Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 2623 and Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 623 are dismissed without prejudice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(gclair, 4) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Dismissal as to Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 2623, Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 623, Beazley USA Services, Inc. by Majestic Oil, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brown, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Majestic Oil, Inc. filed by Majestic Oil, Inc..(Brown, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Majestic Oil, Inc., filed.(Brown, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 2623, Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 623, Beazley USA Services, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(LoriPurifoy, 4) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 623, filed.(Gibson, Ethan) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 2623, filed.(Gibson, Ethan) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Beazley USA Services, Inc., filed.(Gibson, Ethan) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Beazley USA Services, Inc., Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 2623, Beazley Lloyd's Syndicate 623 filed by MAJESTIC OIL, INC.. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by MAJESTIC OIL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gibson, Ethan) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, filed.(Gibson, Ethan) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Underwriters at Lloyd's, London (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23037724) filed by MAJESTIC OIL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gibson, Ethan) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEAZLEY USA SERVICES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA BEAZLEY INSURANCE SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Michael Brown

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ethan Graham Gibson