This case was last updated from PACER on 11/24/2019 at 09:23:06 (UTC).

Mai-Ha v. Fidelity Life Association et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 Mai-Ha filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Fidelity Life Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan van Keulen and Lucy H. Koh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-06045

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan van Keulen

Presiding Judge

Lucy H. Koh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Catherine Mai-Ha

Defendants

Fidelity Life Association

Concentrix Insurance Administration Solutions Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bao-Quan P. Pham

Attorney at Bravo & Margulies

901 Market Street, Suite 450

San Francisco, CA 94103

Defendant Attorney

Matthew Jacob Adler

Attorney at Drinker Biddle Reath LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Fidelity Life Association identifying Corporate Parent Vericity Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Members Mutual Holding Company, Corporate Parent Vericity, Inc. for Fidelity Life Association. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Certification of Interested Entites or Persons (Adler, Matthew) (Filed on 10/4/2019) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

7 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#7

(#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 10/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2019) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#5

(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Fidelity Life Association.. (Adler, Matthew) (Filed on 9/27/2019) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fidelity Life Association re 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, (Adler, Matthew) (Filed on 9/26/2019) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#3

(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/17/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/24/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2019) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

1 #2

Certificate/Proof of Service

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL Defendant Fidelity Life Association's Notice of Removal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1332 (Diversity of Citizenship) from Superior Court of California Santa Clara. Their case number is 19-cv-344694. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13736580). Filed byFidelity Life Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Adler, Matthew) (Filed on 9/25/2019) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Fidelity Life Association identifying Corporate Parent Vericity Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Members Mutual Holding Company, Corporate Parent Vericity, Inc. for Fidelity Life Association. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Certification of Interested Entites or Persons (Adler, Matthew) (Filed on 10/4/2019) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • (#8) **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to Hon. Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for January 29, 2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due 7 days prior. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2019) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 10/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2019) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • (#6) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2019) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Fidelity Life Association.. (Adler, Matthew) (Filed on 9/27/2019) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fidelity Life Association re 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, (Adler, Matthew) (Filed on 9/26/2019) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/17/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/24/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2019) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • (#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/10/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2019) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL Defendant Fidelity Life Association's Notice of Removal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1332 (Diversity of Citizenship) from Superior Court of California Santa Clara. Their case number is 19-cv-344694. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13736580). Filed byFidelity Life Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Adler, Matthew) (Filed on 9/25/2019) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONCENTRIX INSURANCE ADMINISTRATION SOLUTIONS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Fidelity Life Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Jacob Adler