This case was last updated from PACER on 11/22/2021 at 07:14:52 (UTC).

Lindblad v. SalesForce

Case Summary

On 09/23/2021 Lindblad filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against SalesForce. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Laurel Beeler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-07432

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laurel Beeler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Lindblad

San Francisco, CA 94123

Defendant

Salesforce

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Order. In the attached order, the court screens the complaint for deficiencies. The plaintiff may file an amended complaint by October 25, 2021 if he can cure the deficiencies. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/4/2021. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#12

(#12) MOTION For Misc. Relief filed by Robert Lindblad. Responses due by 11/12/2021. Replies due by 11/19/2021. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2021) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#11

(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Salesforce filed by Robert Lindblad. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2021) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

10 #1

Envelope

10 #10

Main Document

#9

(#9) EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed by Robert Lindblad. (Related document(s) #1 ) (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2021) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Reassign All Cases (beyond Magistrates) filed by Robert Lindblad. Responses due by 10/13/2021. Replies due by 10/20/2021. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2021) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#6

(#6) Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#5

(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Robert Lindblad. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2021) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

4 #2

Pro Se Handbook

4 #1

Self Help Flyer

#4

3 #1

Standing Order

#3

#2

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION For Misc. Relief filed by Robert Lindblad. Responses due by 11/12/2021. Replies due by 11/19/2021. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2021) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Salesforce filed by Robert Lindblad. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2021) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of document Received by Robert Lindblad (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2021) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed by Robert Lindblad. (Related document(s) #1 ) (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2021) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order. In the attached order, the court screens the complaint for deficiencies. The plaintiff may file an amended complaint by October 25, 2021 if he can cure the deficiencies. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/4/2021. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Reassign All Cases (beyond Magistrates) filed by Robert Lindblad. Responses due by 10/13/2021. Replies due by 10/20/2021. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2021) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Robert Lindblad. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2021) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE AND ORDER: The attached notice and order notifies the plaintiff of resources available, attaches the district's handbook for litigants who do not have a lawyer, includes a flyer for contacting the court's help desk and instructs the plaintiff about serving the defendants. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 09/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Self Help Flyer, #2 Pro Se Handbook)(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/16/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/23/2021 11:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert Lindblad. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2021) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (no process) against Salesforce filed by Robert Lindblad. (IFPP) Consent/Declination due by 10/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2021) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Salesforce.com, Inc. is a litigant