This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:10:44 (UTC).

KING V. CITY OF GAINESVILLE

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 KING filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CITY OF GAINESVILLE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are ALLEN C WINSOR and GARY R JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00315

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ALLEN C WINSOR

Referral Judge

GARY R JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Jason King

CITY OF GAINESVILLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

DENNIS ALOYSIUS CREED, III

Attorney at CREED LAW GROUP - TAMPA FL

13043 West Linebaugh Ave

Tampa, FL 33626

MICHELE FELICIA MARTIN

Attorney at CITY OF GAINESVILLE

200 E University Street, Room 425

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 2/3/20. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 2/18/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/18/2020. Discovery due by 5/29/2020. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 6/19/2020. (bkp) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

5 #2

Exhibit PL's Employee Notice

5 #1

Exhibit PL's Posts - Part of IA Investigation

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss All Counts of PL's Complaint and Memorandum of Law In Support by CITY OF GAINESVILLE. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 2/12/2020). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PL's Posts - Part of IA Investigation, #2 Exhibit PL's Employee Notice) (MARTIN, MICHELE) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JASON KING. CITY OF GAINESVILLE served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020. (CREED, DENNIS) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to CITY OF GAINESVILLE. (tss) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of filing summons to be issued by clerk by JASON KING re #1 Complaint (CREED, DENNIS) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CITY OF GAINESVILLE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4731029.), filed by Jason King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (CREED, DENNIS) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 2/3/20. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 2/18/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/18/2020. Discovery due by 5/29/2020. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 6/19/2020. (bkp) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss All Counts of PL's Complaint and Memorandum of Law In Support by CITY OF GAINESVILLE. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 2/12/2020). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PL's Posts - Part of IA Investigation, #2 Exhibit PL's Employee Notice) (MARTIN, MICHELE) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JASON KING. CITY OF GAINESVILLE served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020. (CREED, DENNIS) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to CITY OF GAINESVILLE. (tss) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of filing summons to be issued by clerk by JASON KING re #1 Complaint (CREED, DENNIS) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CITY OF GAINESVILLE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4731029.), filed by Jason King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (CREED, DENNIS) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less