This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2020 at 09:02:03 (UTC).

Thomas et al v. Interactive Brokers LLC

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 Thomas filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Interactive Brokers LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Barbara M. G. Lynn and Sam A. Lindsay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-02999

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Barbara M. G. Lynn

Sam A. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Delsa U Thomas

The Solomon Fund, LP

The Solomon Fund LP

Defendants

IINTERACTIVE BROKERS LLC

Interactive Brokers LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Keron Andre Wright

Attorney at Wright Legal Services PLLC

4925 Greenville Avenue, Suite 200

Dallas, TX 75206

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER: This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the docket of the Honorable Sam A. Lindsay. All future pleadings shall subsequently be filed under Civil Action No. 3:20-cv-02999-L. Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 10/9/2020) (ykp) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Interactive Brokers LLC. (mjr) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#2

(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Delsa U Thomas, The Solomon Fund, LP. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11217833) Clerk to issue summonses for federal and non-federal defendants. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Wright, Keron) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the docket of the Honorable Sam A. Lindsay. All future pleadings shall subsequently be filed under Civil Action No. 3:20-cv-02999-L. Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 10/9/2020) (ykp) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Interactive Brokers LLC. (mjr) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Delsa U Thomas, The Solomon Fund, LP. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11217833) Clerk to issue summonses for federal and non-federal defendants. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Wright, Keron) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERACTIVE BROKERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keron Andre Wright