This case was last updated from PACER on 08/16/2019 at 07:21:20 (UTC).

v. HOOPES

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 v HOOPES was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judge overseeing this case is Freda L. Wolfson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-13698

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

 

Party Details

Respondent

ROBERT PARTICK HOOPES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

ROBERT PATRICK HOOPES

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Certified Mail Receipt Returned sent to ROBERT PARTICK HOOPES re #2 Order to Show Cause,, (JB, ) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#1

(#1) Copy of Order D-19-18 of the Supreme Court of New Jersey temporarily suspending Respondent, ROBERT PARTICK HOOPES, from the practice of law pending the final resolution of ethics proceedings against him, effective immediately, and until further Order of the Court, etc. (Ti) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER that ROBERT PARTICK HOOPES, be and he hereby is disbarred and permanently restrained and enjoined from the practice of law before this Court pursuant to L.Civ.R.104.1(a)(4), effective immediately. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 8/12/2019. (jem) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#4

(#4) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Show Cause Hearing held on 7/26/2019. No appearance/response from respondent. Court Ordered respondent be permanently suspended from practice before this Court and be stricken from the roll of attorneys admitted to practice before this Court. Order to be filed. (Court Reporter/Recorder Vincent Russoniello.) (jmm, ) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER FOR TEMPORARY SUSPENSION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ORDERED, Pursuant to L. Civ. R. 104.1 (a), ROBERT PATRICK HOOPES, be temporarily suspended from the practice of law before this Court; This Order shall remain in effect pending further disciplinary proceeding; and it is further ORDERED that respondent show cause, in writing, on or before 7/26/2019, as to why respondent shall not be permanently suspended from practice before this Court and be stricken from the roll of attorneys admitted to practice before this Court.. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/24/2019. (Ti) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER that ROBERT PARTICK HOOPES, be and he hereby is disbarred and permanently restrained and enjoined from the practice of law before this Court pursuant to L.Civ.R.104.1(a)(4), effective immediately. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 8/12/2019. (jem) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Show Cause Hearing held on 7/26/2019. No appearance/response from respondent. Court Ordered respondent be permanently suspended from practice before this Court and be stricken from the roll of attorneys admitted to practice before this Court. Order to be filed. (Court Reporter/Recorder Vincent Russoniello.) (jmm, ) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certified Mail Receipt Returned sent to ROBERT PARTICK HOOPES re #2 Order to Show Cause,, (JB, ) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER FOR TEMPORARY SUSPENSION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ORDERED, Pursuant to L. Civ. R. 104.1 (a), ROBERT PATRICK HOOPES, be temporarily suspended from the practice of law before this Court; This Order shall remain in effect pending further disciplinary proceeding; and it is further ORDERED that respondent show cause, in writing, on or before 7/26/2019, as to why respondent shall not be permanently suspended from practice before this Court and be stricken from the roll of attorneys admitted to practice before this Court.. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/24/2019. (Ti) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Copy of Order D-19-18 of the Supreme Court of New Jersey temporarily suspending Respondent, ROBERT PARTICK HOOPES, from the practice of law pending the final resolution of ethics proceedings against him, effective immediately, and until further Order of the Court, etc. (Ti) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.