This case was last updated from PACER on 07/14/2020 at 11:15:15 (UTC).

Accordant Communications LLC v. Griffith Barbee PLLC

Case Summary

On 05/15/2020 Accordant Communications LLC filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against Griffith Barbee PLLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam R Cummings. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01265

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam R Cummings

 

Party Details

Debtors

Sayers Construction, LLC

Sayers Construction LLC

Not Classified By Court

Accordant Communications, LLC

Accordant Communications LLC

Garnishees

Griffith Barbee, PLLC

Griffith Barbee PLLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Alex B Roberts

Attorney at Beck Redden LLP

1221 Mckinney Street, Suite 4500

Houston, TX 77010

Shannon A Lang

Attorney at Burford Perry, LLP

700 Louisiana Street, Suite 4545

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Writ of Garnishment Issued as to Griffith Barbee PLLC. (ndt) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER: It is ORDERED that the Petition should be GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue a Writ of Garnishment as to Garnishee Griffith Barbee, PLLC. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 5/18/2020) (ndt) Docket text modified on 5/19/2020 (twd). (Entered: 05/19/2020)

#6

(#6) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alex B Roberts on behalf of Accordant Communications, LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Roberts, Alex) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

4 #2

Proposed Order

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) AMENDED DOCUMENT, Amended Petition for Writ of Garnishment, by Accordant Communications, LLC. Amendment to #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order) (Lang, Shannon) Modified text on 5/19/2020 (mla). (Entered: 05/15/2020)

3 #2

Proposed Order

3 #1

Proposed Order

#3

(#3) ***PLEASE DISREGARD, ATTORNEY TO REFILE*** AMENDED DOCUMENT by Accordant Communications, LLC. Amendment to #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment,,,,. . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order) (Lang, Shannon) Modified on 5/15/2020 (aaa). (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Accordant Communications, LLC. (Lang, Shannon) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

1 #3

Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Order

1 #1

Proposed Order

#1

(#1) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment filed by Accordant Communications, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10841110) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Cover Sheet) (Lang, Shannon) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Writ of Garnishment Issued as to Griffith Barbee PLLC. (ndt) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: It is ORDERED that the Petition should be GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue a Writ of Garnishment as to Garnishee Griffith Barbee, PLLC. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 5/18/2020) (ndt) Docket text modified on 5/19/2020 (twd). (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alex B Roberts on behalf of Accordant Communications, LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Roberts, Alex) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED DOCUMENT, Amended Petition for Writ of Garnishment, by Accordant Communications, LLC. Amendment to #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order) (Lang, Shannon) Modified text on 5/19/2020 (mla). (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ***PLEASE DISREGARD, ATTORNEY TO REFILE*** AMENDED DOCUMENT by Accordant Communications, LLC. Amendment to #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment,,,,. . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order) (Lang, Shannon) Modified on 5/15/2020 (aaa). (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Accordant Communications, LLC. (Lang, Shannon) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment filed by Accordant Communications, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10841110) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Cover Sheet) (Lang, Shannon) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less