This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:51:35 (UTC).

Grey vs Warden, Warden, FCC Coleman

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Grey filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Warden, Warden, FCC Coleman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carlos E. Mendoza and Philip R. Lammens. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00248

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carlos E. Mendoza

Referral Judge

Philip R. Lammens

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Benjamin Grey

Coleman, FL 33521

Respondent

Warden, FCC Coleman

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) INMATE ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Benjamin Grey. (RLK) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Federal filed by Benjamin Grey. (No fees paid, no service copies provided) (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(HAQ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Benjamin Grey. (HAQ) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER dismissing case with prejudice and denying #1 Petition for writ of habeas corpus. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly and is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/30/2019. (DJD) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#4

(#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/5/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/22/2019. (DJD) ctp (DJD). (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#6

(#6) JUDGMENT entered. Civil appeals checklist attached. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (LAB) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) JUDGMENT entered. Civil appeals checklist attached. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (LAB) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER dismissing case with prejudice and denying #1 Petition for writ of habeas corpus. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly and is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/30/2019. (DJD) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/5/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/22/2019. (DJD) ctp (DJD). (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INMATE ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Benjamin Grey. (RLK) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Benjamin Grey. (HAQ) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Federal filed by Benjamin Grey. (No fees paid, no service copies provided) (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(HAQ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less