This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/06/2021 at 09:33:19 (UTC).

Garner v. Global Plasma Solutions Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 Garner filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Global Plasma Solutions Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00665

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert S. Garner

Defendant

Global Plasma Solutions Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tiffany Joanne Cramer

Robert J. Kriner, Jr.

Scott M. Tucker

Steffan T. Keeton

Timothy Mathews

Defendant Attorneys

Adam Wyatt Poff

R. Trent Taylor

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

14 #1

Exhibit L

#14

13 #1

Word Count Certification

#13

#12

7 #1

Exhibit A - K

#7

6 #1

Word Count Certification

#6

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Timothy Mathews for Robert S. Garner added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy N. Mathews filed by Robert S. Garner. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/22/2021. (fms) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REQUEST for Oral Argument by Global Plasma Solutions Inc. re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Poff, Adam) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy N. Mathews - filed by Robert S. Garner. (Kriner, Robert) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney R. Trent Taylor for Global Plasma Solutions Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Steffan T. Keeton for Robert S. Garner added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert A. Muckenfuss, Esquire, R. Trent Taylor, Esquire and S. Virginia Bondurant Price, Esquire filed by Global Plasma Solutions Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/15/2021. (fms) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DECLARATION re #13 Reply Brief of Adam W. Poff by Global Plasma Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L)(Poff, Adam) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPLY BRIEF re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Global Plasma Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Word Count Certification)(Poff, Adam) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert A. Muckenfuss, Esquire, R. Trent Taylor, Esquire and S. Virginia Bondurant Price, Esquire - filed by Global Plasma Solutions Inc.. (Poff, Adam) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steffan T. Keeton - filed by Robert S. Garner. (Tucker, Scott) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AirClean Holdings, Inc. for Global Plasma Solutions Inc. filed by Global Plasma Solutions Inc.. (Poff, Adam) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DECLARATION re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Adam W. Poff by Global Plasma Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - K)(Poff, Adam) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Global Plasma Solutions Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Word Count Certification)(Poff, Adam) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Global Plasma Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Poff, Adam) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert S. Garner. Global Plasma Solutions Inc. served on 5/11/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (Kriner, Robert) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (kmd) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Global Plasma Solutions Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3610609.) - filed by Robert S. Garner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less