This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2020 at 12:04:00 (UTC).

Viale et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corp et al

Case Summary

On 01/03/2019 Viale filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Air Liquid Systems Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Maxine M. Chesney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00038

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maxine M. Chesney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Debbie L. Viale

Amber Jacobs

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

General Electric Company

Air & Liquid Systems Corp

Keenan Properties Inc.

Crane Co.

Calaveras Asbestos Ltd

Exxonmobile Corporation

Trane USA

AMEC Foster Wheeler USA Corporation

Allied Packing & Supply

A.W. Chesterton Company

Goulds Pumps LLC

Soco-West, Inc.

Chevron U.S.A. Inc.

30 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nectaria Belantis

Attorney at The Paul Law Firm

3011 Townsgate Road, Suite 450

Westlake Village, CA 91361

Defendant Attorneys

Charles S. Park

Attorney at Hugo Parker, LLP

240 Stockton Street, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Edward R. Hugo

Attorney at Hugo Parker, LLP

240 Stockton Street, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

W. Joseph Gunter

Attorney at CMBG3 Law LLC

505 Montgomery, Suite 1045

San Francisco, CA 94108

Geoffrey M Davis

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

10100 Santa Monica Bl., 7Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jennifer Denise Fitzpatrick

Attorney at Dehay & Elliston, LLP

100 Pringle Avenue, Suite 700

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Susan A. Ogdie

Attorney at DeHay & Elliston LLP

100 Pringle Avenue, Suite 700

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Stephen Lindsay Jenkins

Attorney at Manning Gross + MassenburgLLP

201 Spear Street, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Joseph Duffy

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

One Market Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1126

Amy Jo Talarico

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius, LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

Michael Quinn Eagan, Jr.

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

Andy Justin Goetz

Attorney at Prindle, Goetz, Barnes and Reinholtz LLP

310 Golden Shore, 4Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802

Michael Howard Schuck

Attorney at Prindle, Goetz, Barnes and Reinholtz LLP

310 Golden Shore, 4Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802

Other Attorneys

Cristyn Nicole Chadwick

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP

333 S. Hope St., Ste. 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Nell Gibson Moley

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

560 Mission Street, Suite 2100

San Francisco, CA 94105

Patrick Casey Mathews

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP

1 Market Street, Steuart Tower, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

Aaron Michael Brian

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

One Embarcadero Center, 32Nd Floor, Suite 4100

San Francisco, CA 94111

Michael E Flynn-O'Brien

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP

1 Market Street, Spear Tower, Suite 3900

San Francisco, CA 94105

Francis Dennis Pond

Attorney at Pond North LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Lisa Lurline Oberg

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

One Market Plaza, Spear Tower, 24Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

41 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#216

#215

#214

#213

#212

#211

#210

#209

#181

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#3

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

314 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#216) NOTICE of Appearance by Gina Ann Haran (Haran, Gina) (Filed on 11/25/2019) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#215) ANSWER to #181 Second Amended Complaint For Wrongful Death and Survival Actions - Asbestos by Santa Fe Braun, Inc.. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 11/22/2019) Modified on 11/25/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#214) NOTICE by Santa Fe Braun, Inc. re #211 Notice of Appearance DEFENDANT SANTA FE BRAUN INC'S RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 11/22/2019) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#213) Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons by Santa Fe Braun, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent 15375 Memorial Corporation for Santa Fe Braun, Inc.. re #211 Notice of Appearance (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 11/22/2019) Modified on 11/25/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#212) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Santa Fe Braun, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent 15375 Memorial Corporation for Santa Fe Braun, Inc.. re #211 Notice of Appearance and Notice of Interested Parties (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 11/22/2019) Modified on 11/25/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#211) NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Renee Chaves NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR SANTA FE BRAUN INC. (Chaves, Marisa) (Filed on 11/22/2019) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#210) ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT ELEMENTIS CHEMICALS INC.< The complaint is dismissed with prejudice as to defendant Elementis Chemicals Inc., formerly known as Harcros Chemicals Inc., successor-in-interest to Harrisons < Crosfield (Pacific) Inc. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 13, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#209) Certificate of Interested Entities by Certainteed Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Compagnie De Saint-Gobain, Other Affiliate DBMP LLC for Certainteed Corporation. Amended (Jackson, Michelle) (Filed on 10/30/2019) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#208) STIPULATION and Proposed Order Re Dismissal of Defendant Elementis Chemicals Inc. filed by Elementis Chemicals Inc. (Fitzpatrick, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/30/2019) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#207) ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT ANHEUSER-BUSCH, LLC'S (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ANHEUSER-BUSCH INBEV WORLDWIDE INC.). The complaint is dismissed with prejudice as to Anheuser-Busch. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 29, 2019.(mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
209 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by AMEC Foster Wheeler USA Corporation.. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 1/9/2019) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2019) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of filing State Court ANSWER to Complaint for Damages by Allied Fluid Prodcuts Corp fka Allied Packing & Supply, Inc. (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 1/7/2019) Modified on 1/8/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by Allied Fluid Prodcuts Corp fka Allied Packing & Supply, Inc. (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 1/7/2019) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Allied Fluid Prodcuts Corp fka Allied Packing & Supply, Inc... (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 1/7/2019) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Thomas Cordery on behalf of Allied Fluid Products Corp fka Allied Packing & Supply Inc. (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 1/7/2019) Modified on 1/8/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/18/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2019) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 44611016004. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2019) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT Please be advised that the filing fee has not been received in this case. The fee must be paid within two business days or the case will be subject to termination. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2019) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT from Alameda Superior Court California. Their case number is RG18927446. Filed by AMEC Foster Wheeler USA Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Park, Charles) (Filed on 1/3/2019) Modified on 1/8/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less