This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/17/2022 at 14:44:24 (UTC).

Hale v. Foster Wheeler, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/08/2022 Hale filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Foster Wheeler, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00826

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lora Hale

Dennis Hale

Defendants

Foster Wheeler, LLC

ITT LLC

The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company

Alfa Lavel Inc.

Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.

Warren Pumps, LLC

Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. FKA Atwood & Morrill

Air & Liquid Systems Corp.

Velan Valve Corp.

IMO Industries, Inc.

The William Powell Company

Gardner Denver, Inc.

FLOWSERVE US INC., solely as successor to Edward Valves, Inc., Vogt Valve Company, Nordstrom Valves, Inc. and Rockwell Manufacturing Company

Volvo Group North America LLC

Crane Co.

Paccar Inc

BW/IP, INC. and ITS WHOLLY-OWNED SUBSIDIARIES

FLOWSERVE US INC. as successor-in-interest to DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION erroneously sued as FLOWSERVE US, INC., individually and as successor-in-interest to DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel Lee Keller

Attorney at Keller, Fishback & Jackson LLP

28720 Canwood Street, Suite 200

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

John Bruce Jackson

Attorney at Keller, Fishback & Jackson LLP

28720 Roadside Drive, Suite 201

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

Stephen Michael Fishback

Attorney at Keller, Fishback & Jackson LLP

28720 Canwood Street Suite 200

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

Defendant Attorneys

Charles S. Park

Attorney at Hugo Parker, LLP

240 Stockton Street, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Amy Jo Talarico

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius, LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

Joseph Duffy

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

300 South Grand Avenue, 22Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Marisa Renee Chaves

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

Sean Christopher McGah

Attorney at Manning Gross Massenburg LLP

400 Spectrum Center Dr., Suite 1450

Irvine, CA 92618

Ana Teresa Reeg

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell and Young LLP

One Post Street, Suite 2400

San Francisco, CA 94104

Randall Keith Bernard

Attorney at Hawkins, Parnell & Young LLP

1 Post Street, Suite 2400

San Francisco, CA 94104

James P. Cunningham

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

201 Mission Street, Suite 2310

San Francisco, CA 94105

Emily D. Bergstrom

Attorney at BHC Law Group LLP

5900 Hollis Street, Suite O

Emeryville, CA 94608

Kurt Tyler Putnam

Attorney at BHC Law Group LLP

5900 Hollis Street, Suite O

Emeryville, CA 94608

James G. Scadden

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

1111 Broadway, Suite 1700

Oakland, CA 94607

Bobbie Rae Bailey

Attorney at Leader Berkon Colao & Silverstein LLP

550 S. Hope Street, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Edward Martinovich

Attorney at Leader Berkon Colao & Silverstein

550 South Hope Street, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Frederick W. Gatt

Attorney at Leader Berkon Colao & Silverstein LLP

550 S. Hope Street, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Gilliam Fipp Stewart

Attorney at CMBG3 Law LLC

100 Spectrum Center Drive, Suite 820

Irvine, CA 92618

W. Joseph Gunter

Attorney at CMBG3 Law P.C

100 Spectrum Center Drive, Suite 820

Irvine, CA 92618

20 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#169

(#169) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. FKA Atwood & Morrill identifying Corporate Parent TWG Investments for Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. FKA Atwood & Morrill. re #33 Certificate of Interested Entities (Putnam, Kurt) (Filed on 5/16/2022) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#168

(#168) NOTICE by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. FKA Atwood & Morrill re Memorandum to Court Regarding Name Change of Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Putnam, Kurt) (Filed on 5/16/2022) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#166

(#166) NOTICE of Appearance by Bartek R Rejch for Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, as Successor by Merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc. (Rejch, Bartek) (Filed on 5/11/2022) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#165

(#165) NOTICE of Appearance by Bartek R Rejch for Defendant VELAN VALVE CORP. (Rejch, Bartek) (Filed on 5/11/2022) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#164

(#164) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #162 Stipulation Dismissing Action as to Defendant Cummins Inc. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2022) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#163

(#163) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #161 Stipulation DISMISSING ACTION AS TO DEFENDANT PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2022) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

162 #1

Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER Dismissing Action as to Defendant Cummins Inc.

162 #162

Main Document

#33

(#169) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. FKA Atwood & Morrill identifying Corporate Parent TWG Investments for Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. FKA Atwood & Morrill. re #33 Certificate of Interested Entities (Putnam, Kurt) (Filed on 5/16/2022) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#7

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Foster Wheeler, LLC re #6 Certificate of Interested Entities, #5 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), #4 Notice of Appearance, #7 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Park, Charles) (Filed on 2/9/2022) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#6

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Foster Wheeler, LLC re #6 Certificate of Interested Entities, #5 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), #4 Notice of Appearance, #7 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Park, Charles) (Filed on 2/9/2022) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#5

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Foster Wheeler, LLC re #6 Certificate of Interested Entities, #5 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), #4 Notice of Appearance, #7 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Park, Charles) (Filed on 2/9/2022) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#4

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Foster Wheeler, LLC re #6 Certificate of Interested Entities, #5 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), #4 Notice of Appearance, #7 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Park, Charles) (Filed on 2/9/2022) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by Foster Wheeler, LLC . (Park, Charles) (Filed on 2/9/2022) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

1 #3

Certificate/Proof of Service

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit to Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court

1 #1

Main Document

164 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#169) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. FKA Atwood & Morrill identifying Corporate Parent TWG Investments for Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. FKA Atwood & Morrill. re #33 Certificate of Interested Entities (Putnam, Kurt) (Filed on 5/16/2022) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#168) NOTICE by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. FKA Atwood & Morrill re Memorandum to Court Regarding Name Change of Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Putnam, Kurt) (Filed on 5/16/2022) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#166) NOTICE of Appearance by Bartek R Rejch for Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, as Successor by Merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc. (Rejch, Bartek) (Filed on 5/11/2022) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#165) NOTICE of Appearance by Bartek R Rejch for Defendant VELAN VALVE CORP. (Rejch, Bartek) (Filed on 5/11/2022) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket*** Party Cummins Inc. and Parker Hannifin Corporation Terminated, See Docket Nos. #163 and #164 .*** (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2022) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#164) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #162 Stipulation Dismissing Action as to Defendant Cummins Inc. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2022) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#163) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #161 Stipulation DISMISSING ACTION AS TO DEFENDANT PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2022) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • Docket(#167) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/10/2022.Total Time in Court: 18 minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Stephen Fishback. Defendant Attorney: Amy Talarico; Ana Reeg; Randall Bernard; Kurt Putnam; Frederick Gatt; Gilliam Stewart; James Ostertag; Geoffrey Davis; Shaghig Agopian; Nicole Yuen; Andrew Sharp; Peter Renstrom; Michael Estrada; John Rosenthal; Lance Wilson; and Bartek Rejch. Parties are advised that case will be referred to Magistrate Judge Hixson for settlement proceedings. The Court sets the deadlines as follows: August 9, 2022-last day for counsel for plaintiff to either amend the pleadings or dismiss the case; August 16, 2022-parties to e-file a joint case management statement; and August 23, 2022 at 2:00 p.m.-telephonic further case management conference. The August 23rd proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/10/2022) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#162) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Cummins Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER Dismissing Action as to Defendant Cummins Inc.)(Thacker, Todd) (Filed on 5/10/2022) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#161) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Parker Hannifin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING ACTION AS TO DEFENDANT PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION)(Huie, Jeremy) (Filed on 5/10/2022) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
156 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2022) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Foster Wheeler, LLC re #6 Certificate of Interested Entities, #5 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), #4 Notice of Appearance, #7 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Park, Charles) (Filed on 2/9/2022) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Foster Wheeler, LLC.. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 2/9/2022) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by Foster Wheeler, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Amec Foster Wheeler plc, a publicly traded company for Foster Wheeler, LLC. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 2/9/2022) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Personal Injuries byFoster Wheeler, LLC. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 2/9/2022) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles S. Park DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (Park, Charles) (Filed on 2/9/2022) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/23/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2022) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by Foster Wheeler, LLC . (Park, Charles) (Filed on 2/9/2022) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached. [err201] Please resubmit current Civil Cover Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/2020) from our website www.cand.uscourts.gov . No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet.This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Foster Wheeler, LLC. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2022) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-21-276981. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-16884901). Filed byFoster Wheeler, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Park, Charles) (Filed on 2/8/2022) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLOWSERVE US, INC. SOLEY AS SUCESSOR TO ALIAS : VOGT VALVE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where VELAN VALVE CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP INC. is a litigant